Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2784279

EP2784279 - EXHAUST PURIFICATION DEVICE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.08.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 21.11.2018  [2018/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha
1 Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / TSUKAMOTO, Yoshihisa
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1 Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP
02 / NAKAYAMA, Shigeki
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1 Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP
03 / NISHIOKA, Hiromasa
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1 Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP
04 / OTSUKI, Hiroshi
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1 Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP
05 / MATSUO, Junichi
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1 Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP
06 / IMAI, Daichi
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1 Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP
07 / ITO, Kazuhiro
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1 Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP
 [2016/39]
Former [2014/40]01 / TSUKAMOTO, Yoshihisa
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1 Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP
02 / NAKAYAMA, Shigeki
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1 Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP
03 / NISHIOKA, Hiromasa
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1 Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP
04 / OTSUKI, Hiroshi
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1 Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP
05 / MATSUO, Junichi
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1 Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP
06 / IMAI, Daichi
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1 Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP
07 / ITO, Kazuhiro
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1 Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2014/40]
Application number, filing date11876356.422.11.2011
[2016/39]
WO2011JP76922
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013076814
Date:30.05.2013
Language:JA
[2013/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2784279
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2784279
Date:28.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP30.05.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:F01N3/08, F01N3/20, F01N11/00
[2015/16]
Former International [2014/40]F01N3/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ABGASREINIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR[2014/40]
English:EXHAUST PURIFICATION DEVICE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE[2014/40]
French:DISPOSITIF DE PURIFICATION DE GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT POUR MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE[2014/40]
Entry into regional phase19.05.2014Translation filed 
19.05.2014National basic fee paid 
19.05.2014Search fee paid 
19.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
19.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.04.2012Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
19.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/40]
09.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.03.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.07.2016Fee for grant paid
12.07.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.07.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.03.2016
Opposition(s)29.06.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.11.2011
AL28.09.2016
AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CY28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
MK28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
TR28.09.2016
IE22.11.2016
MT22.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
FR30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG28.12.2016
GB28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
[2018/47]
Former [2018/45]HU22.11.2011
AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CY28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
MK28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
TR28.09.2016
IE22.11.2016
MT22.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
FR30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG28.12.2016
GB28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
Former [2018/43]HU22.11.2011
AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CY28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
MK28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
IE22.11.2016
MT22.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
FR30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG28.12.2016
GB28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
Former [2018/30]HU22.11.2011
AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CY28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
MK28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
IE22.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
FR30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG28.12.2016
GB28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
Former [2017/51]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
IE22.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
FR30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG28.12.2016
GB28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
Former [2017/50]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
IE22.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
FR30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
Former [2017/43]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
Former [2017/35]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
Former [2017/34]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
Former [2017/23]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
Former [2017/23]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
Former [2017/13]FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
BE30.11.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
Former [2017/11]FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
BE30.11.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
BE30.11.2016
NO28.12.2016
Former [2017/09]FI28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
NO28.12.2016
Former [2017/07]LT28.09.2016
Documents cited:Search[A]DE102005001119  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 2 * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0048]; figures 1,2 *
International search[Y]JP2004257325  (MITSUBISHI FUSO TRUCK AND BUS CORP.);
 [Y]JP2008240614  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP.)
by applicantJP2010138883
 JP2002155732