Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2786885

EP2786885 - STRUCTURE FOR FRONT PART OF VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.08.2018
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP
[2014/41]
Inventor(s)01 / TAMAKOSHI, Koji
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi
Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB
Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A
85354 Freising / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/41]Kuhnen & Wacker
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro
Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A
85354 Freising / DE
Application number, filing date11876425.730.11.2011
[2017/40]
WO2011JP77703
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013080339
Date:06.06.2013
Language:JA
[2013/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2786885
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2786885
Date:04.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP06.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:B60K11/04, B60H1/26, B62D25/08, B60H1/00, F01P1/00
[2017/19]
Former International [2015/52]B60K11/04, B60H1/26, B62D25/08, B60H1/00
Former International [2014/41]B60K11/04, B60H1/26, B62D25/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:STRUKTUR FÜR DEN VORDERTEIL EINER FAHRZEUGKAROSSERIE[2014/41]
English:STRUCTURE FOR FRONT PART OF VEHICLE[2014/41]
French:STRUCTURE POUR LA PARTIE AVANT D'UN VÉHICULE[2014/41]
Entry into regional phase17.04.2014Translation filed 
17.04.2014National basic fee paid 
17.04.2014Search fee paid 
17.04.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
17.04.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.03.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
17.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
12.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.04.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.08.2017Fee for grant paid
18.08.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.08.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.04.2017
Opposition(s)05.07.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
10.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU30.11.2011
AT04.10.2017
CY04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
IT04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
MC04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
PL04.10.2017
RO04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SI04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
IE30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
LU30.11.2017
MT30.11.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
[2019/47]
Former [2019/31]HU30.11.2011
AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
IT04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
MC04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
PL04.10.2017
RO04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SI04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
IE30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
LU30.11.2017
MT30.11.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/52]AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
IT04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
MC04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
PL04.10.2017
RO04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SI04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
IE30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
LU30.11.2017
MT30.11.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/50]AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
IT04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
MC04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
PL04.10.2017
RO04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
IE30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
LU30.11.2017
MT30.11.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/45]AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
IT04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
MC04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
PL04.10.2017
RO04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
CH30.11.2017
IE30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
LU30.11.2017
MT30.11.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/43]AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
IT04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
MC04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
PL04.10.2017
RO04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
LU30.11.2017
MT30.11.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/40]AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
IT04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
MC04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
PL04.10.2017
RO04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
LU30.11.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/39]AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
IT04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
MC04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
PL04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
LU30.11.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/38]AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
MC04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
PL04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
LU30.11.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/37]AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
MC04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
PL04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/36]AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
MC04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
PL04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/35]AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
MC04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/23]AT04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/22]ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
NO04.01.2018
Former [2018/17]NL04.10.2017
Documents cited:Search[YA]WO2010097890  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]; AJISAKA SATOSHI [JP]) [Y] 1-3,6 * the whole document * [A] 4,5;
 [YA]JP2007050801  (MAZDA MOTOR) [Y] 1-3 * paragraphs [0001] - [0004] - [0021]; figures 1-2 * [A] 4,5;
 [Y]JPH08142642  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [Y] 6 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE3203927  (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1-6 * pages 11-16; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]JP2001020742  (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *
International search[Y]WO2010097890  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP.);
 [Y]JP2001020742  (NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.);
 [Y]JPH08142642  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD.);
 [A]JPH079841  (NIPPONDENSO CO., LTD.)