Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2787681

EP2787681 - DATA PROCESSING DEVICE, DATA PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.08.2017
Database last updated on 17.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 07.11.2018  [2018/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
[2014/41]
Inventor(s)01 / HATTORI, Mitsuhiro
c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
02 / HIRANO, Takato
c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
03 / MORI, Takumi
c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
04 / ITO, Takashi
c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
05 / MATSUDA, Nori
c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Theresienhöhe 11a
80339 München / DE
[2016/41]
Former [2014/41]Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Theresienhöhe 11a
80339 München / DE
Application number, filing date11876549.430.11.2011
[2016/41]
WO2011JP77623
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013080320
Date:06.06.2013
Language:JA
[2013/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2787681
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2787681
Date:12.10.2016
Language:EN
[2016/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP06.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04L9/30, G09C1/00
[2014/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:DATENVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, DATENVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM[2014/41]
English:DATA PROCESSING DEVICE, DATA PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM[2014/41]
French:DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES ET PROGRAMME[2014/41]
Entry into regional phase27.03.2014Translation filed 
27.03.2014National basic fee paid 
27.03.2014Search fee paid 
27.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
27.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
30.10.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.03.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.07.2016Fee for grant paid
22.07.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.07.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.03.2016
Opposition(s)13.07.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU30.11.2011
AT12.10.2016
BE12.10.2016
CY12.10.2016
CZ12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
ES12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
IT12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
MC12.10.2016
MK12.10.2016
NL12.10.2016
PL12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SE12.10.2016
SI12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
SM12.10.2016
TR12.10.2016
CH30.11.2016
IE30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
MT30.11.2016
BG12.01.2017
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
[2018/45]
Former [2018/43]HU30.11.2011
AT12.10.2016
BE12.10.2016
CY12.10.2016
CZ12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
ES12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
IT12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
MC12.10.2016
MK12.10.2016
NL12.10.2016
PL12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SE12.10.2016
SI12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
SM12.10.2016
CH30.11.2016
IE30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
MT30.11.2016
BG12.01.2017
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
Former [2018/30]HU30.11.2011
AT12.10.2016
BE12.10.2016
CY12.10.2016
CZ12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
ES12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
IT12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
MC12.10.2016
MK12.10.2016
NL12.10.2016
PL12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SE12.10.2016
SI12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
SM12.10.2016
CH30.11.2016
IE30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG12.01.2017
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
Former [2017/51]AT12.10.2016
BE12.10.2016
CZ12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
ES12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
IT12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
MC12.10.2016
NL12.10.2016
PL12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SE12.10.2016
SI12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
SM12.10.2016
CH30.11.2016
IE30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG12.01.2017
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
Former [2017/43]AT12.10.2016
BE12.10.2016
CZ12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
ES12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
IT12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
MC12.10.2016
NL12.10.2016
PL12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SE12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
SM12.10.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG12.01.2017
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
Former [2017/38]AT12.10.2016
BE12.10.2016
CZ12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
ES12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
IT12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
MC12.10.2016
NL12.10.2016
PL12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SE12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
SM12.10.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
BG12.01.2017
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
Former [2017/37]AT12.10.2016
BE12.10.2016
CZ12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
ES12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
IT12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
MC12.10.2016
NL12.10.2016
PL12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SE12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
SM12.10.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
Former [2017/36]AT12.10.2016
BE12.10.2016
CZ12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
ES12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
MC12.10.2016
NL12.10.2016
PL12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SE12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
Former [2017/34]AT12.10.2016
BE12.10.2016
CZ12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
ES12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
MC12.10.2016
NL12.10.2016
PL12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SE12.10.2016
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
Former [2017/33]AT12.10.2016
BE12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
ES12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
MC12.10.2016
NL12.10.2016
PL12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SE12.10.2016
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
Former [2017/26]AT12.10.2016
BE12.10.2016
ES12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
NL12.10.2016
PL12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SE12.10.2016
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
Former [2017/23]AT12.10.2016
BE12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
NL12.10.2016
PL12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SE12.10.2016
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
Former [2017/12]LV12.10.2016
BE30.11.2016
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2006054208  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 1-8 *
 [A]  - TATSUAKI OKAMOTO ET AL, Homomorphic Encryption and Signatures from Vector Decomposition, PAIRING-BASED CRYPTOGRAPHY - PAIRING 2008; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE], SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 57 - 74, ISBN 978-3-540-85503-3, XP019103359 [A] 1-10 * section 1,4,5 *
 [A]  - DAN BONEH ET AL, Evaluating 2-DNF Formulas on Ciphertexts, THEORY OF CRYPTOGRAPHY : SECOND THEORY OF CRYPTOGRAPHY CONFERENCE, TCC 2005, CAMBRIDGE, MA, USA, FEBRUARY 10 - 12, 2005 ; PROCEEDINGS; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE], BERLIN [U.A.] : SPRINGER, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 325 - 341, ISBN 978-3-540-24573-5, XP047029378 [A] 1-10 * section 1-4 *
International search[A]JP2008521025  (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.);
 [A]WO2011052056  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al);
 [A]JP2011211593  (FUJITSU LTD)
 [Y]  - GOLLE, P. ET AL., "Universal Re-encryption for Mixnets", LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE, (20040130), vol. 2964, pages 163 - 178, XP019002807
 [Y]  - BONEH, D. ET AL., "Evaluating 2-DNF Formulas on Ciphertexts", LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE, (20050127), vol. 3378, pages 325 - 341, XP047029378
 [Y]  - OKAMOTO, T. ET AL., "Homomorphic Encryption and Signatures from Vector Decomposition", LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE, (20080825), vol. 5209, pages 57 - 74, XP008155972
 [A]  - MITSUHIRO HATTORI ET AL., "Secure Biometric Authentication Using 2-DNF Homomorphic Encryption", IEICE TECHNICAL REPORT, (20091105), vol. 109, no. 272, pages 113 - 120, XP008171585
by applicantWO2011052056
 JP2007293807
    - TAKATO HIRANO; TAKUMI MORI; MITSUHIRO HATTORI; TAKASHI ITO; NORI MATSUDA, "Homomorphic encryption based countermeasure against active attacks in privacy-preserving biometric authentication", IEICE TRANSACTIONS, ISEC 2010-73, (2011), pages 7 - 14,
    - T. OKAMOTO; K. TAKASHIMA, "Homomorphic encryption and signatures from vector decomposition", PAIRING 2008, LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE, (2008), vol. 5209, pages 57 - 74, XP019103359
    - D. BONEH; E.-J. GOH; K. NISSIM, "Evaluating 2-DNF formulas on ciphertexts", THEORY OF CRYPTOGRAPHY CONFERENCE, LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE, (2005), vol. 3378, pages 325 - 341, XP047029378
    - C. GENTRY, "Fully homomorphic encryption using ideal lattices", ACM SYMPOSIUM ON THEORY OF COMPUTING, (2009), doi:doi:10.1145/1536414.1536440, pages 169 - 178, XP058164708

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1536414.1536440
    - D. FREEMAN; M. SCOTT; E. TESKE, "A taxonomy of pairing-friendly elliptic curves", JOURNAL OF CRYPTOLOGY, (200906),