Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2786576

EP2786576 - MOTION ESTIMATION METHODS FOR RESIDUAL PREDICTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.09.2018
Database last updated on 14.07.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.10.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.08.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[2014/41]
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Sang-Hee
46 Cabot Avenue
Santa Clara, California 95051 / US
02 / FU, Fangwen
1900 Prairie City Road
Folsom, California 95630 / US
03 / LEI, Zhijun
13161 Bertani Street
Portland, Oregon 97229 / US
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[2017/47]
Former [2014/41]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date11876665.801.12.2011
[2017/47]
WO2011US62778
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013081615
Date:06.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2786576
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2013
[2014/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2786576
Date:22.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR06.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04N19/42, H04N19/43, H04N19/51, H04N19/30, H04N19/463, H04N19/132, H04N19/184
[2015/32]
Former International [2014/41]H04N7/32, H04N7/26, H04N7/36
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:BEWEGUNGSMESSVERFAHREN FÜR RESTVORHERSAGEN[2014/41]
English:MOTION ESTIMATION METHODS FOR RESIDUAL PREDICTION[2014/41]
French:PROCÉDÉS D'ESTIMATION DE MOUVEMENT POUR PRÉDICTION RÉSIDUELLE[2014/41]
Entry into regional phase02.05.2014National basic fee paid 
02.05.2014Search fee paid 
02.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
02.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
22.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.09.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.10.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
19.12.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.08.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.10.2017Fee for grant paid
16.10.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.10.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.03.2016
Opposition(s)23.08.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU01.12.2011
AT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
ES22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
IT22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
MC22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
PL22.11.2017
RO22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
SI22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
IE01.12.2017
LU01.12.2017
MT01.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
FR22.01.2018
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
[2019/31]
Former [2019/30]AT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
ES22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
IT22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
MC22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
PL22.11.2017
RO22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
SI22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
IE01.12.2017
LU01.12.2017
MT01.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
FR22.01.2018
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/52]AT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
ES22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
IT22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
PL22.11.2017
RO22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
SI22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
IE01.12.2017
LU01.12.2017
MT01.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
FR22.01.2018
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/49]AT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
ES22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
IT22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
PL22.11.2017
RO22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
IE01.12.2017
LU01.12.2017
MT01.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
FR22.01.2018
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/45]AT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
ES22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
IT22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
PL22.11.2017
RO22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
IE01.12.2017
LU01.12.2017
MT01.12.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/43]AT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
ES22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
IT22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
PL22.11.2017
RO22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
LU01.12.2017
MT01.12.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/40]AT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
ES22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
IT22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
PL22.11.2017
RO22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/39]AT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
ES22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
IT22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
PL22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/37]AT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
ES22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
PL22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/35]AT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
ES22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT22.11.2017
ES22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/23]AT22.11.2017
ES22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/22]ES22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
NO22.02.2018
Documents cited:Search[XI]US7864857  (HOBBS DAVID V [CA]) [X] 1,4,8,9,13,14 * abstract * * column 5, line 47 - column 8, line 2 * * claim 1 * [I] 2,3,5-7,10-12;
 [A]WO2009051692  (THOMSON LICENSING [FR], et al) [A] 1-3,9,10,13,14 * abstract * * page 2, line 16 - line 33 *;
 [A]EP2061248  (IBBT VZW [BE], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0076] * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US2006176961  (HUO YAN [HK], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * * figures 1-4 *
International search[A]US2011188576  (CLERCKX TOM [BE], et al);
 [A]US2006176961  (HUO YAN [HK], et al);
 [A]US2011216834  (ZHOU MINHUA [US])
by applicantUS7864857