Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2785885

EP2785885 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE SUSPENSION IN A SUSPENSION SMELTING FURNACE, A SUSPENSION SMELTING FURNACE, AND A CONCENTRATE BURNER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.05.2019
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.01.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OUTOTEC (FINLAND) OY
Rauhalanpuisto 9
02230 Espoo / FI
[2017/18]
Former [2017/16]For all designated states
OUTOTEC (FINLAND) OY
Puolikkotie 10
02230 Espoo / FI
Former [2016/39]For all designated states
Outotec Oyj
Rauhalanpuisto 9
02230 Espoo / FI
Former [2014/41]For all designated states
Outotec Oyj
Puolikkotie 10
02230 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / LAHTINEN, Markku
Latvatie 11 Z
FI-02710 Espoo / FI
02 / PESONEN, Lauri P.
Pieni Roobertinkatu 4-6 L 63
FI-00130 Helsinki / FI
03 / AHOKAINEN, Tapio
Vanhaväylä 19 A
FI-00830 Helsinki / FI
04 / BJÖRKLUND, Peter
Oppilaantie 13 A 5
FI-02360 Espoo / FI
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Boco IP Oy Ab
Itämerenkatu 5
00180 Helsinki / FI
[2014/41]
Application number, filing date11876769.829.11.2011
[2019/24]
WO2011FI51055
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013079762
Date:06.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2785885
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2013
[2014/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2785885
Date:12.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:FI06.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:C22B15/00, F27D3/18
[2014/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DER SUSPENSION IN EINEM SUSPENSIONSSCHMELZOFEN, SUSPENSIONSSCHMELZOFEN UND KONZENTRATBRENNER[2014/41]
English:METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE SUSPENSION IN A SUSPENSION SMELTING FURNACE, A SUSPENSION SMELTING FURNACE, AND A CONCENTRATE BURNER[2014/41]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE CONTRÔLE DE LA SUSPENSION DANS UN FOUR À FUSION DE SUSPENSION, FOUR À FUSION DE SUSPENSION ET BRÛLEUR DE CONCENTRÉ[2014/41]
Entry into regional phase30.06.2014National basic fee paid 
30.06.2014Search fee paid 
30.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
30.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
30.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.04.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.04.2019Fee for grant paid
16.04.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.04.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.01.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
25.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
24.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
23.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
24.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
22.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipLT12.06.2019
NO12.09.2019
[2019/47]
Documents cited:Search[XA]WO2011048263  (OUTOTEC OYJ [FI]; SIPILAE JUSSI [FI]) [X] 1-25,27 * figures 1,5 * [A] 26;
 [XA]US5912401  (FUJII TAKAYOSHI [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-5,8-13,26,27 * column 7, lines 6-7; figure 4; claims 1-6 * * column 6, lines 30-67 * [A] 6,7,15-25;
 [X]WO9814741  (OUTOKUMPU OY [FI]; HOLMI ISMO [FI]; JOKINEN TUOMO [FI]; LILJA LAUNO [F) [X] 14-25 * figures 1-4; claims 1-32 *;
 [XA]JPS58221241  (MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO) [X] 1-13,26,27 * abstract * [A] 14-25;
 [XA]WO0070104  (OUTOKUMPU OY [FI]; HANNIALA PEKKA [FI]; KOJO ILKKA [FI]; SAARINEN RIST) [X] 1-13 * figure 1; claims 1-5 * * page 6, line 17 - page 7, line 14 * [A] 14-27;
 [A]WO0070103  (OUTOKUMPU OY [FI]; KOJO ILKKA [FI]; KYTOE MARKKU [FI]) [A] 1-27 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3674463  (YANNOPOULOS JOHN C) [A] 1-27 * the whole document *
International search[A]FI100889B  (OUTOKUMPU OY);
 [AD]JPS58221241  (MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO);
 [AD]WO0070103  (OUTOKUMPU OY ET AL.);
 [A]GB1243568  (CONZINC RIOTINTO LTD)
by applicantJPS58221241
 WO0070103
 WO2011048263
 US5912401
 WO9814741
 WO0070104
 US2506577