Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2789866

EP2789866 - COMPACT LINEAR ROLLER GUIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.01.2017
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.01.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.02.2017  [2017/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Salguero Beltran, Andrés Ernesto
Cra 7 No. 40 - 90 Ed. Emilio Arango 4° Piso
Bogotá / CO
For all designated states
Manrique Torres, Martha Ruth
Cra 7 No. 40 - 90 Ed. Emilio Arango 4° Piso
Bogotá / CO
For all designated states
Yamhure Kattah, Germán
Cra 7 No. 40 - 90 Ed. Emilio Arango 4° Piso
Bogotá / CO
For all designated states
Pontificia Universidad Javeriana
Cra 7 No. 40 - 90 Ed. Emilio Arango 4° Piso
Bogotá / CO
[2014/42]
Inventor(s)01 / SALGUERO BELTRAN, Andrés Ernesto
Cra 7 No. 40-90
Ed. Emilio Arango
4° Piso
Bogotá / CO
02 / MANRIQUE TORRES, Martha Ruth
Cra 7 No. 40-90
Ed. Emilio Arango
4° Piso
Bogotá / CO
03 / YAMHURE KATTAH, Germán
Cra 7 No. 40-90
Ed. Emilio Arango
4° Piso
Bogotá / CO
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Carvajal y Urquijo, Isabel , et al
Clarke, Modet & Co.
Suero de Quiñones, 34-36
28002 Madrid / ES
[2014/42]
Application number, filing date11876862.105.12.2011
WO2011IB55465
Filing languageES
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013084024
Date:13.06.2013
Language:ES
[2013/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2789866
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:ES13.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.12.2015
ClassificationInternational:F16C29/04, B61B13/02, B61B13/06
[2016/03]
Former International [2014/42]F16C29/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/42]
TitleGerman:KOMPAKTE LINEARROLLENFÜHRUNG[2014/42]
English:COMPACT LINEAR ROLLER GUIDE[2014/42]
French:GUIDE LINÉAIRE COMPACT À ROULEAUX[2014/42]
Entry into regional phase05.06.2014Translation filed 
05.06.2014National basic fee paid 
05.06.2014Search fee paid 
05.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
05.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/42]
22.07.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/07]
27.09.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
26.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
01.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP1101682  (NIPPON SHOOTER LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-6 * figure 26 *;
 [Y]DE102008060759  (SCHAEFFLER KG [DE]) [Y] 1-6 * figures 1-2 *;
 [A]US5735214  (TSUBOI NOBUYUKI [JP]) [A] 1,7 * figure 14 *;
 [A]JPH11129896  (TSUBOI NOBUYUKI) [A] 1,7 * figure - *
International search[X]EP1101682  (NIPPON SHOOTER);
 [Y]US4158315  (KENSRUE ET AL.);
 [A]DE202004004963U  (ENGLHARD);
 [A]FR2367938  (LASMARIGUES);
 [A]US2907610  (WISE)
by applicantDE4324059
 US2003070465