Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2789135

EP2789135 - ADMISSION CONTROL FOR CONTROL CHANNEL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.05.2019
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.05.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  28.01.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[2018/26]
Former [2015/49]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Former [2014/42]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / KARLSSON, Robert
Igelbäcksvägen 8
S-174 62 Sundbyberg / SE
02 / SUNELL, Kai-Erik
Synålsvägen 7
S-168 73 Bromma / SE
03 / HURD, Magnus
Marmorgatan 13A
S-118 67 Stockholm / SE
04 / ARVIDSON, Pontus
Ruddammsvägen 4
S-114 21 Stockholm / SE
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Ericsson
Patent Development
Torshamnsgatan 21-23
164 80 Stockholm / SE
[2018/26]
Former [2014/42]Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich , et al
Ericsson AB
Patent Unit Kista RAN 1
Torshamnsgatan 23
164 80 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date11876886.006.12.2011
[2018/26]
WO2011SE51478
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013085438
Date:13.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2789135
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2013
[2014/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2789135
Date:27.06.2018
Language:EN
[2018/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE13.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W72/12, // H04W28/16, H04L5/00, H04L5/14
[2018/07]
Former International [2015/32]H04W72/12, H04L5/00, // H04W28/16
Former International [2014/42]H04L12/70, H04W28/18, H04W72/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/42]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZULASSUNGSSTEUERUNG FÜR STEUERKANAL[2014/42]
English:ADMISSION CONTROL FOR CONTROL CHANNEL[2014/42]
French:CONTRÔLE D'ADMISSION POUR CANAL DE COMMANDE[2018/07]
Former [2014/42]PROCÉDÉ ET N UD DE RÉSEAU
Entry into regional phase23.06.2014National basic fee paid 
23.06.2014Search fee paid 
23.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
23.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/42]
01.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.12.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.06.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.01.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.05.2018Fee for grant paid
15.05.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.05.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.12.2016
Opposition(s)28.03.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
28.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
27.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT27.06.2018
CZ27.06.2018
DK27.06.2018
EE27.06.2018
ES27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
IT27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
MC27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
PL27.06.2018
RO27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
SI27.06.2018
SK27.06.2018
SM27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
LU06.12.2018
[2019/40]
Former [2019/39]AT27.06.2018
CZ27.06.2018
DK27.06.2018
EE27.06.2018
ES27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
IT27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
PL27.06.2018
RO27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
SI27.06.2018
SK27.06.2018
SM27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
LU06.12.2018
Former [2019/37]AT27.06.2018
CZ27.06.2018
DK27.06.2018
EE27.06.2018
ES27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
IT27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
PL27.06.2018
RO27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
SI27.06.2018
SK27.06.2018
SM27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
Former [2019/26]AT27.06.2018
CZ27.06.2018
DK27.06.2018
EE27.06.2018
ES27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
IT27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
PL27.06.2018
RO27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
SK27.06.2018
SM27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
Former [2019/12]AT27.06.2018
CZ27.06.2018
EE27.06.2018
ES27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
IT27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
PL27.06.2018
RO27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
SK27.06.2018
SM27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
Former [2019/11]AT27.06.2018
CZ27.06.2018
EE27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
IT27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
PL27.06.2018
RO27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
SK27.06.2018
SM27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
Former [2019/10]AT27.06.2018
CZ27.06.2018
EE27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
PL27.06.2018
RO27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
SK27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
Former [2019/09]EE27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
Former [2019/08]FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
Former [2019/03]FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
Former [2018/52]FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
Former [2018/51]FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
Former [2018/50]FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
Former [2018/49]FI27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
Former [2018/47]FI27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
NO27.09.2018
Documents cited:Search[I]WO2010112085  (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS OY [FI]; BALL CARSTEN [DE]; MUELLNER ROBERT [DE) [I] 1-12 * abstract * * page 1, lines 1-7 * * page 3, line 4 - page 14, line 18 * * page 16, line 29 - page 28, line 4 *;
 [A]US2006002318  (KUURNE ANTTI [FI]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *
 [A]  - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA); Physical layer procedures (Release 10)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 36.213, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110925), vol. RAN WG1, no. V10.3.0, pages 1 - 122, XP050553950 [A] 1-12 * the whole document *
 [A]  - ANAS M ET AL, "Combined Admission Control and Scheduling for QoS Differentiation in LTE Uplink", VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 2008. VTC 2008-FALL. IEEE 68TH, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080921), ISBN 978-1-4244-1721-6, pages 1 - 5, XP031352502 [A] 1-12 * the whole document *
International search[X]WO2010112085  (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS OY [FI], et al);
 [A]US2006002318  (KUURNE ANTTI [FI])
 [A]  - SAS, B. ET AL., "Self-Optimisation of Admission Control and Handover Parameters in LTE", VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, (20110515), pages 1 - 2, XP031896556

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETECS.2011.5956153
 [A]  - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA); Physical layer procedures (Release 10)", 3GPP TS 36.213 V10.3.0, (20110927), pages 71 - 75, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Specs/archive/36_series/36.213/36213-a30.zip, (20121204), XP050553950
by applicantWO2010112085
 US2006002318
    - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (EUTRA); Physical layer procedures (Release 10", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 36.213, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP, MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE, (20110925), vol. RAN WG1, pages 1 - 122
    - "Combined Admission Control and Scheduling for QoS Differentiation in LTE uplink", ANAS M et al., VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 2008. VTC 2008-FALL IEEE 68TH, IEEE, (20080921), pages 1 - 5