Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2789135 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2789135



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 256
02.05.2019 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
09.07.2018 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
01.06.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
15.05.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.05.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
15.05.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 6
15.05.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
15.05.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
29.01.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
29.01.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
29.01.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
29.01.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 31
29.01.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 31
14.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.06.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
14.06.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
14.06.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
14.06.2017 Description Search / examination 2
14.06.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
14.06.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
03.05.2017 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
18.04.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.04.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
18.04.2017 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.12.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
15.12.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
09.12.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
01.07.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
27.06.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 20
23.06.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
01.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
01.02.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
01.02.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
01.02.2016 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
01.02.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 6
01.02.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
01.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.01.2016 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
22.12.2015 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 5
12.11.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
29.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.10.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.10.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
24.07.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
08.07.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
08.07.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 6
08.07.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
25.06.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
11.05.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
04.05.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 5
17.09.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
16.07.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
11.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.07.2014 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
01.07.2014 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
01.07.2014 Notice on debiting of fees Search / examination 1
23.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.06.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 10
23.06.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
02.06.2014 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
22.04.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
13.06.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
13.06.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 33