Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2789135


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
25.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.11.2019 [2019/48]
30.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.10.2019  [2019/40]
23.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.09.2019  [2019/39]
09.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.09.2019  [2019/37]
24.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.06.2019  [2019/26]
03.05.2019 No opposition filed within time limit published on  05.06.2019  [2019/23]
22.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.03.2019  [2019/13]
15.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
08.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.03.2019  [2019/11]
01.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.03.2019  [2019/10]
25.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.02.2019  [2019/09]
18.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.02.2019  [2019/08]
14.12.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.01.2019  [2019/03]
23.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.12.2018  [2018/52]
16.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.12.2018  [2018/51]
09.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.12.2018  [2018/50]
02.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.12.2018  [2018/49]
19.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.11.2018  [2018/47]
25.05.2018 (Expected) grant published on  27.06.2018  [2018/26]
18.05.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
18.05.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
16.05.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
28.01.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
12.01.2018 Change - classification published on  14.02.2018  [2018/07]
12.01.2018 Change - classification published on  14.02.2018  [2018/07]
12.01.2018 Change - French title published on  14.02.2018  [2018/07]
05.01.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.06.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
26.04.2017 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
06.01.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.12.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
16.12.2016 First examination report
28.06.2016 Change - representative
03.02.2016 Amendment by applicant
08.01.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.11.2015 Change - representative
04.11.2015 Change - applicant published on  02.12.2015  [2015/49]
03.07.2015 Change - classification published on  05.08.2015  [2015/32]
03.07.2015 Change - classification published on  05.08.2015  [2015/32]
03.07.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  05.08.2015  [2015/32]
07.05.2015 Change - representative
13.02.2015 Change - extension states published on  18.03.2015  [2015/12]
10.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.09.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  15.10.2014  [2014/42]
12.09.2014 Request for examination filed published on  15.10.2014  [2014/42]
17.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
09.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
26.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
25.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
24.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
20.06.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
24.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
14.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication