Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2789135 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201180075315 EP11876886



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2013085438Global Dossier 13.06.2013A1
Priority number Date
WO2011SE51478 06.12.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9538551Global Dossier 03.01.2017B2
US2015036563 05.02.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2011SE51478 06.12.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103975560BGlobal Dossier 06.06.2017B
CN103975560 06.08.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2011SE51478 06.12.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2789135Global Dossier 27.06.2018B1
EP2789135 05.08.2015A4
EP2789135 15.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2011SE51478 06.12.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112014012908 13.06.2017A2
Priority number Date
WO2011SE51478 06.12.2011