Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2792557

EP2792557 - BRAKE DEVICE AND BRAKING CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.12.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP
[2017/03]
Former [2014/43]For all designated states
Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha
1 Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / YAMAMOTO, Takayuki
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi
Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP
 [2017/05]
Former [2014/43]01 / YAMAMOTO, Takayuki
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1 Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP
Representative(s)Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
[2017/05]
Former [2014/43]Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Bavariaring 10
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date11877196.314.12.2011
[2017/05]
WO2011JP06998
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013088475
Date:20.06.2013
Language:JA
[2013/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2792557
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2792557
Date:01.02.2017
Language:EN
[2017/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP20.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:B60T8/00
[2014/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:BREMSVORRICHTUNG UND BREMSSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2014/43]
English:BRAKE DEVICE AND BRAKING CONTROL DEVICE[2014/43]
French:DISPOSITIF DE FREIN ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE FREINAGE[2014/43]
Entry into regional phase11.07.2014Translation filed 
11.07.2014National basic fee paid 
11.07.2014Search fee paid 
11.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
11.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.08.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
11.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
24.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.07.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.11.2016Fee for grant paid
21.11.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.11.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.07.2016
Opposition(s)03.11.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2018/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
24.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.12.2011
AT01.02.2017
CY01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
MC01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SI01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
SM01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
[2019/47]
Former [2019/31]HU14.12.2011
AT01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
MC01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SI01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
SM01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2019/30]AT01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
MC01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SI01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
SM01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2018/14]AT01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SI01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
SM01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2017/51]AT01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
SM01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2017/50]AT01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2017/49]AT01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2017/48]AT01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2017/41]AT01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]JP2010188942  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP.);
 [A]JP2005343194  (ADVICS CO., LTD.);
 [A]JP2007100725  (HITACHI, LTD.)
by applicantJP2007100725