Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2791974

EP2791974 - GATE ROUNDING FOR REDUCED TRANSISTOR LEAKAGE CURRENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.10.2018
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.02.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2014/43]
Inventor(s)01 / CAI, Yanfei
Room 2002
No. 164 Lane 100
Zhongtan Road
Putuo District
Shanghai 200016 / CN
02 / LI, Ji
Room 502
No. 17 Lane 825
Chang Dao Road
Pudong New Area
Shanghai 200129 / CN
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Wegner, Hans
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[2014/43]
Application number, filing date11877284.714.12.2011
WO2011CN83934
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013086693
Date:20.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2791974
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2013
[2014/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN20.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:H01L29/78, H01L21/336, H01L29/423, H01L21/28, H01L29/49, H01L27/088
[2015/17]
Former International [2014/43]H01L29/78, H01L21/336
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
TitleGerman:GATE-ABRUNDUNG FÜR REDUZIERTEN TRANSISTOR-LECKSTROM[2014/43]
English:GATE ROUNDING FOR REDUCED TRANSISTOR LEAKAGE CURRENT[2014/43]
French:ARRONDISSEMENT DE LA GÂCHETTE POUR COURANT DE FUITE DE TRANSISTOR RÉDUIT[2014/43]
Entry into regional phase01.07.2014National basic fee paid 
01.07.2014Search fee paid 
01.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
01.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
29.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.02.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.10.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
05.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
07.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
08.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
08.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
10.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[X]US2006097294  (YAMASHITA KYOJI [JP] ET AL) [X] 1,2,7 * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0072] *;
 [X]US6876042  (YU BIN [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,7 * column 3, line 35 - column 4, line 25 *;
 [XY]US5874754  (LEE JASOPIN [US] ET AL) [X] 1-5,7,11,13-15 * column 6, line 30 - column 11, line 15; figures 5,6 * [Y] 12;
 [XY]US2007096158  (KOMAKI MASAKI [JP]) [X] 1,2,7 * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0049] * [Y] 12
International search[A]CN1516287  (TAIWAN INTEGRATED CIRCUIT MFR CO LTD);
 [A]US2002130354  (NATIONAL INST. OF ADVANCED IND. SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOG)
by applicantUS2006097294
 US6876042
 US5874754