Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2792969

EP2792969 - AIR CONDITIONING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.06.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
[2014/43]
Inventor(s)01 / MORIMOTO, Osamu
c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
02 / SHIMAMOTO, Daisuke
c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
03 / AZUMA, Koji
c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
04 / HONDA, Takayoshi
c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Theresienhöhe 11a
80339 München / DE
[2016/34]
Former [2014/43]Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Theresienhöhe 11a
80339 München / DE
Application number, filing date11877584.016.12.2011
[2016/34]
WO2011JP07041
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013088482
Date:20.06.2013
Language:JA
[2013/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2792969
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2792969
Date:24.08.2016
Language:EN
[2016/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP20.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:F24D3/18, F24D19/10, F25B13/00, F25B1/00, F24F11/02
[2016/16]
Former International [2015/34]F25B1/00, F24F11/02, F24D3/18, F24D19/10
Former International [2014/43]F25B1/00, F24F11/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:KLIMAANLAGE[2014/43]
English:AIR CONDITIONING DEVICE[2014/43]
French:DISPOSITIF DE CLIMATISATION[2014/43]
Entry into regional phase27.03.2014Translation filed 
27.03.2014National basic fee paid 
27.03.2014Search fee paid 
27.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
27.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
04.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.04.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.07.2016Fee for grant paid
14.07.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.07.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.04.2016
Opposition(s)26.05.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
30.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU16.12.2011
AL24.08.2016
AT24.08.2016
BE24.08.2016
CY24.08.2016
CZ24.08.2016
DK24.08.2016
EE24.08.2016
FI24.08.2016
HR24.08.2016
IS24.08.2016
IT24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
LV24.08.2016
MC24.08.2016
MK24.08.2016
NL24.08.2016
PL24.08.2016
RO24.08.2016
RS24.08.2016
SE24.08.2016
SI24.08.2016
SK24.08.2016
SM24.08.2016
TR24.08.2016
BG24.11.2016
NO24.11.2016
GR25.11.2016
IE16.12.2016
LU16.12.2016
MT16.12.2016
PT26.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
FR02.01.2017
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU16.12.2011
AT24.08.2016
BE24.08.2016
CY24.08.2016
CZ24.08.2016
DK24.08.2016
EE24.08.2016
FI24.08.2016
HR24.08.2016
IS24.08.2016
IT24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
LV24.08.2016
MC24.08.2016
MK24.08.2016
NL24.08.2016
PL24.08.2016
RO24.08.2016
RS24.08.2016
SE24.08.2016
SI24.08.2016
SK24.08.2016
SM24.08.2016
TR24.08.2016
BG24.11.2016
NO24.11.2016
GR25.11.2016
IE16.12.2016
LU16.12.2016
MT16.12.2016
PT26.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
FR02.01.2017
Former [2018/43]HU16.12.2011
AT24.08.2016
BE24.08.2016
CY24.08.2016
CZ24.08.2016
DK24.08.2016
EE24.08.2016
FI24.08.2016
HR24.08.2016
IS24.08.2016
IT24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
LV24.08.2016
MC24.08.2016
MK24.08.2016
NL24.08.2016
PL24.08.2016
RO24.08.2016
RS24.08.2016
SE24.08.2016
SI24.08.2016
SK24.08.2016
SM24.08.2016
BG24.11.2016
NO24.11.2016
GR25.11.2016
IE16.12.2016
LU16.12.2016
MT16.12.2016
PT26.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
FR02.01.2017
Former [2018/30]HU16.12.2011
AT24.08.2016
BE24.08.2016
CY24.08.2016
CZ24.08.2016
DK24.08.2016
EE24.08.2016
FI24.08.2016
HR24.08.2016
IS24.08.2016
IT24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
LV24.08.2016
MC24.08.2016
MK24.08.2016
NL24.08.2016
PL24.08.2016
RO24.08.2016
RS24.08.2016
SE24.08.2016
SI24.08.2016
SK24.08.2016
SM24.08.2016
BG24.11.2016
NO24.11.2016
GR25.11.2016
IE16.12.2016
LU16.12.2016
PT26.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
FR02.01.2017
Former [2017/49]AT24.08.2016
BE24.08.2016
CZ24.08.2016
DK24.08.2016
EE24.08.2016
FI24.08.2016
HR24.08.2016
IT24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
LV24.08.2016
MC24.08.2016
NL24.08.2016
PL24.08.2016
RO24.08.2016
RS24.08.2016
SE24.08.2016
SI24.08.2016
SK24.08.2016
SM24.08.2016
BG24.11.2016
NO24.11.2016
GR25.11.2016
IE16.12.2016
LU16.12.2016
PT26.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
FR02.01.2017
Former [2017/45]AT24.08.2016
BE24.08.2016
CZ24.08.2016
DK24.08.2016
EE24.08.2016
FI24.08.2016
HR24.08.2016
IT24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
LV24.08.2016
MC24.08.2016
NL24.08.2016
PL24.08.2016
RO24.08.2016
RS24.08.2016
SE24.08.2016
SI24.08.2016
SK24.08.2016
SM24.08.2016
BG24.11.2016
NO24.11.2016
GR25.11.2016
PT26.12.2016
Former [2017/37]AT24.08.2016
BE24.08.2016
CZ24.08.2016
DK24.08.2016
EE24.08.2016
FI24.08.2016
HR24.08.2016
IT24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
LV24.08.2016
NL24.08.2016
PL24.08.2016
RO24.08.2016
RS24.08.2016
SE24.08.2016
SI24.08.2016
SK24.08.2016
SM24.08.2016
BG24.11.2016
NO24.11.2016
GR25.11.2016
PT26.12.2016
Former [2017/32]AT24.08.2016
BE24.08.2016
CZ24.08.2016
DK24.08.2016
EE24.08.2016
FI24.08.2016
HR24.08.2016
IT24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
LV24.08.2016
NL24.08.2016
PL24.08.2016
RO24.08.2016
RS24.08.2016
SE24.08.2016
SK24.08.2016
SM24.08.2016
BG24.11.2016
NO24.11.2016
GR25.11.2016
PT26.12.2016
Former [2017/13]AT24.08.2016
FI24.08.2016
HR24.08.2016
IT24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
LV24.08.2016
NL24.08.2016
RS24.08.2016
SE24.08.2016
NO24.11.2016
GR25.11.2016
PT26.12.2016
Former [2017/11]AT24.08.2016
FI24.08.2016
HR24.08.2016
IT24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
NL24.08.2016
RS24.08.2016
SE24.08.2016
NO24.11.2016
GR25.11.2016
PT26.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI24.08.2016
HR24.08.2016
IT24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
NL24.08.2016
RS24.08.2016
SE24.08.2016
NO24.11.2016
Former [2017/09]FI24.08.2016
IT24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
NL24.08.2016
NO24.11.2016
Former [2017/07]LT24.08.2016
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP2309199  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 1,2,4-8 * paragraphs [0051] , [0054] , [0070]; figures 8,9 *;
 [Y]EP1484559  (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,2,4-8 * paragraphs [0042] , [0057] - [0061]; figures 1,2,3,6,7 *;
 [A]EP0496505  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * column 30, line 46 - column 31, line 20 *
International search[Y]WO2011099054  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP.);
 [Y]JP2006112781  (DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD.);
 [Y]JP2002048399  (DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD.);
 [Y]JP2000186868  (RINNAI CORP.);
 [A]JP2009236392  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD.);
 [A]JP2003222391  (DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD.)
by applicantWO2010049998