Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2791807

EP2791807 - AUTOMATIC DOWNSTREAM TO UPSTREAM MODE SWITCHING AT A UNIVERSAL SERIAL BUS PHYSICAL LAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.03.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.04.2019  [2019/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[2014/43]
Inventor(s)01 / WANG, Jennifer C.
9533 S. Kenneth Place
Tempe, Arizona 85284 / US
02 / BERACOECHEA, Alejandro Lenero
4522 E Cathedral Rock Drive
Phoenix, Arizona 85044 / US
03 / CHANG, Nai-Chih
4078
W Jasper Drive
Chandler, Arizona 85226 / US
04 / McGOWAN, Steven B.
2565 SW 112th Place
Portland, Oregon 97225 / US
 [2018/38]
Former [2014/43]01 / WANG, Jennifer C.
9533 S. Kenneth Place
Tempe, Arizona 85284 / US
02 / BERACOECHEA, Alejandro Lenero
4522 E Cathedral Rock Drive
Phoenix, Arizona 85044 / US
03 / CHANG, Nai-Chih
2146 E. Libra Place
Chandler, Arizona 85249 / US
04 / McGOWAN, Steven B.
2565 SW 112th Place
Portland, Oregon 97225 / US
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Fountain Precinct
Balm Green
Sheffield S1 2JA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/43]Jennings, Vincent Louis
HGF Limited
Fountain Precinct
Balm Green
Sheffield S1 2JA / GB
Application number, filing date11877596.416.12.2011
WO2011US65610
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013089789
Date:20.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2791807
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2013
[2014/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR20.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F13/14, G06F13/40
[2015/32]
Former International [2014/43]G06F13/14
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
TitleGerman:AUTOMATISCHE MODUSUMSCHALTUNG ZWISCHEN DOWNSTREAM UND UPSTREAM BEI EINER PHYSIKALISCHEN SCHICHT EINES USB[2014/43]
English:AUTOMATIC DOWNSTREAM TO UPSTREAM MODE SWITCHING AT A UNIVERSAL SERIAL BUS PHYSICAL LAYER[2014/43]
French:BASCULEMENT AUTOMATIQUE DU MODE AVAL AU MODE AMONT DANS UNE COUCHE PHYSIQUE D'UN BUS SÉRIE UNIVERSEL[2014/43]
Entry into regional phase09.05.2014National basic fee paid 
09.05.2014Search fee paid 
09.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
09.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
02.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.08.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.06.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.10.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/15]
23.11.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2019/15]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.08.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201808   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[I]US2007255885  (BOHM MARK R [US] ET AL) [I] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [I]US2006056401  (BOHM MARK R [US] ET AL) [I] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [I]JP2001177543  (ONKYO KK) [I] 1-11 * abstract *;
 [A]US2010077126  (HUANG HAN-CHENG [TW] ET AL) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP2073128  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *
International search[Y]KR20070105855  (STANDARD MICROSYSTEMS CORP.);
 [Y]KR20070118691  (STANDARD MICROSYSTEMS CORP.);
 [Y]JP2001177543  (ONKYO CORP);
 [A]US2010077126  (HAN-CHENG HUANG ET AL.)