Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2795882

EP2795882 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SELECTIVELY ACTIVATING MULTIPLE SUBSCRIBER IDENTITY MODULES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.07.2019
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change - applicantpublished on 04.09.2019 [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Technologies Oy
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
[2019/36]
Former [2015/32]For all designated states
Nokia Technologies Oy
Karaportti 3
02610 Espoo / FI
Former [2014/44]For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / HOLTMANNS, Silke
Härkäpurontie 15
FIN-01800 Klaukkala / FI
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Ruuskanen, Juha-Pekka , et al
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/44]Nokia Corporation
Intellectual Property Department
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
Application number, filing date11877727.523.12.2011
WO2011IB55949
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013093574
Date:27.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2795882
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE27.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04M1/725, H04W8/22, H04W8/24
[2015/34]
Former International [2014/44]H04M1/725, H04W8/18, H04W68/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR SELEKTIVEN AKTIVIERUNG MEHRERER TEILNEHMERIDENTITÄTSMODULE[2014/44]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SELECTIVELY ACTIVATING MULTIPLE SUBSCRIBER IDENTITY MODULES[2014/44]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR ACTIVER SÉLECTIVEMENT DE MULTIPLES MODULES D'IDENTITÉ D'ABONNÉ[2014/44]
Entry into regional phase23.05.2014National basic fee paid 
23.05.2014Search fee paid 
23.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
23.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
04.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.07.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201808   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP1098543  (GUALA DISPENSING SPA [IT]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0019] *;
 [Y]US2004229601  (ZABAWSKYJ BOHDAN KONSTANTYN [CA] ET AL) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0037] *
International search[Y]US5987325  (TAYLOE DANIEL RICHARD);
 [Y]US2004229601  (ZABAWSKYJ BOHDAN KONSTANTYN ET AL);
 [A]GB2428942  (UBIQUISYS LTD);
 [A]WO03056855  (RADIOLINJA AB ET AL);
 [A]US6738622  (STADELMANN ANTON N ET AL);
 [A]WO2005018245  (ROAMWARE INC ET AL)
by applicantUS5987325
 US2004229601
 GB2428942
 WO03056855
 EP1098543