Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2795820

EP2795820 - METHOD, NETWORK NODE, COMPUTER PROGRAM AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR DECODING A SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.08.2017
Database last updated on 22.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.09.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2014/44]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / ZHANG, Haochuan
Ericsson Tower
No. 5 Lize East Street
Chaoyang District
Beijing 100102 / CN
02 / HU, Yang
Ericsson Tower
No.5 Lize East Street
Chaoyang District
Beijing 100102 / CN
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Ericsson
Patent Development
Torshamnsgatan 21-23
164 80 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2014/44]Forsberg, Ulrika S.
Ericsson AB
Patent Unit Kista RAN 1
Torshamnsgatan 23
164 80 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date11877745.721.12.2011
WO2011CN02145
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013091137
Date:27.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2795820
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN27.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04L1/18, H04B1/7075, H04B1/7107, H04L1/00
[2015/32]
Former International [2014/44]H04L1/18
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN, NETZWERKKNOTEN, COMPUTERPROGRAMM UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT ZUR DEKODIERUNG EINES SIGNALS[2014/44]
English:METHOD, NETWORK NODE, COMPUTER PROGRAM AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR DECODING A SIGNAL[2014/44]
French:PROCÉDÉ, N UD DE RÉSEAU, PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR ET PRODUIT PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR POUR LE DÉCODAGE D'UN SIGNAL[2014/44]
Entry into regional phase18.06.2014National basic fee paid 
18.06.2014Search fee paid 
18.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
18.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
10.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.10.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.01.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.09.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.07.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
28.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
27.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
31.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[I]WO2004029554  (TERAYON COMM SYSTEMS INC [US]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0074] *;
 [A]  - NTT DOCOMO ET AL, "Length-4 OCC Mapping Scheme for DM-RS Rank 5-8 in LTE-Advanced", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-102296 OCC MAPPING FOR LTE-A, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100406), vol. RAN WG1, no. Beijing, china; 20100412, XP050419539 [A] 2,3,9,10 * paragraph [001.] - paragraph [003.] *
 [A]  - KAZUAKI TAKEDA ET AL, "Demodulation Reference Signal Using Two-Dimensional Orthogonal Cover Code Mapping for Multi-Antenna/Point Transmission in LTE-Advanced Downlink", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, COMMUNICATIONS SOCIETY, TOKYO, JP, (20111201), vol. E94-B, no. 12, doi:10.1587/TRANSCOM.E94.B.3354, ISSN 0916-8516, pages 3354 - 3361, XP001571988 [A] 2,3,9,10 * abstract * * paragraph [004.] *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1587/transcom.E94.B.3354
International search[Y]WO2007059523  (QUALCOMM INC ET AL.);
 [Y]WO0143302  (TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET ERICSSON L M);
 [Y]CN101292561  (QUALCOMM INC)
by applicantWO2004029554