Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2795820 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2795820



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 127
30.09.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
30.09.2019 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
25.01.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.01.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
25.01.2018 Claims Search / examination 5
25.01.2018 Description Search / examination 1
25.01.2018 Description Search / examination 3
25.01.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
25.01.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
22.11.2017 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
16.11.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.11.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
16.11.2017 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.07.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
25.07.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
12.01.2016 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
22.12.2015 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 5
15.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
15.10.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
15.10.2015 Claims Search / examination 5
15.10.2015 Description Search / examination 2
15.10.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
15.10.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
10.07.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
10.07.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
02.07.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
02.07.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
22.06.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
06.03.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
02.03.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 3
01.10.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
29.07.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
25.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.07.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
18.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
18.06.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
18.06.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
06.05.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
27.06.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
27.06.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 25