Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2795820


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
25.09.2019 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
11.01.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.01.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
05.01.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.11.2017 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
04.08.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
06.01.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.01.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.10.2015 New entry: Reply to examination report
21.07.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
10.07.2015 First examination report
03.07.2015 Change - classification published on  05.08.2015  [2015/32]
03.07.2015 Change - classification published on  05.08.2015  [2015/32]
03.07.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  05.08.2015  [2015/32]
04.03.2015 Change - representative
27.02.2015 Change - extension states published on  01.04.2015  [2015/14]
10.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.09.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  29.10.2014  [2014/44]
26.09.2014 Request for examination filed published on  29.10.2014  [2014/44]
11.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
04.07.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
20.06.2014 Amendment by applicant
18.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
08.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
29.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication