Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2795820
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2013091137Global Dossier 27.06.2013A1
Priority number Date
WO2011CN02145 21.12.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9264180Global Dossier 16.02.2016B2
US2014362956 11.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2011CN02145 21.12.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2795820Global Dossier 05.08.2015A4
EP2795820 29.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2011CN02145 21.12.2011