Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2795986

EP2795986 - WIRELESS WIDE AREA NETWORK (WWAN) ASSISTED PROXIMITY WIRELESS LOCAL AREA NETWORK (WLAN) PEER-TO-PEER (P2P) CONNECTION AND OFFLOADING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.08.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[2014/44]
Inventor(s)01 / YIN, Hujun
14315 Springer Avenue
Saratoga, California 95070 / US
02 / YANG, Rongzhen
Room 28-1401
No.99 JingGu East Road
Shanghai 200240 / CN
03 / FU, Jin
Room 702
No 18 Zhenyue Road
Yangpu District
Room 502 South-14, No.800 Dongchuan Road
Shanghai 200438 / CN
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Fountain Precinct
Balm Green
Sheffield S1 2JA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/44]Hufton, David Alan , et al
HGF Limited
Fountain Precinct
Balm Green
Sheffield S1 2JA / GB
Application number, filing date11877978.420.12.2011
WO2011US66160
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013095382
Date:27.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2795986
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR27.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.12.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W76/02, H04W4/00, H04W92/18, H04W84/12, H04W88/06, H04W12/06
[2016/01]
Former International [2014/44]H04W76/02, H04W92/18, H04W88/06
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
TitleGerman:WLAN- PEER-TO-PEER (P2P)-VERBINDUNG UND -ENTLADUNG MIT UNTERSTÜTZUNG DURCH EIN NAHES WWAN[2014/44]
English:WIRELESS WIDE AREA NETWORK (WWAN) ASSISTED PROXIMITY WIRELESS LOCAL AREA NETWORK (WLAN) PEER-TO-PEER (P2P) CONNECTION AND OFFLOADING[2014/44]
French:CONNEXION ET DÉLESTAGE POSTE À POSTE (P2P) DE RÉSEAU LOCAL SANS FIL (WLAN) DE PROXIMITÉ ASSISTÉ PAR RÉSEAU ÉTENDU SANS FIL (WWAN)[2014/44]
Entry into regional phase09.05.2014National basic fee paid 
09.05.2014Search fee paid 
09.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
09.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
29.06.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.12.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.04.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/39]
21.05.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2019/39]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.12.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201808   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP2161962  (TELIASONERA AB [SE]) [X] 1-3,7-9,11-15 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0030] * * figures 3, 5 * [I] 4-6,10;
 [A]US2007297426  (HAVESON RYAN A [US] ET AL) [A] 4 * paragraph [0064] * * figure 3 *
International search[X]US2010128701  (NAGARAJA, NAGENDRA);
 [A]US2008019333  (KHARIA, YASH ET AL.);
 [A]KR20100132009  (KYOCERA CORPORATION)
by applicantEP2161962