Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2795892

EP2795892 - VIDEO FEED PLAYBACK AND ANALYSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.11.2019
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.12.2019 [2019/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[2014/44]
Inventor(s)01 / BEHAN, Gary M.
16412 South 38th Street
Phoenix, Arizona 85408 / US
02 / DWIYONO, Hend
2111 W Redwood Drive
Chandler, Arizona 85248 / US
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2014/44]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date11878036.021.12.2011
WO2011US66571
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013095453
Date:27.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2795892
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR27.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06T7/20, H04N5/262, H04N9/87, G11B27/02
[2015/35]
Former International [2014/44]H04N5/262, G06T7/20
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
TitleGerman:WIEDERGABE UND UND ANALYSE VON VIDEOZUSPIELUNGEN[2014/44]
English:VIDEO FEED PLAYBACK AND ANALYSIS[2014/44]
French:REPRODUCTION ET ANALYSE DE FLUX VIDÉO[2014/44]
Entry into regional phase12.05.2014National basic fee paid 
12.05.2014Search fee paid 
12.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
12.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
08.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.02.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.07.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/49]
29.07.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2019/49]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.08.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201808   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US2004096085  (MATSUMOTO NOBUYUKI [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6514081  (MENGOLI JEFFREY L [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2008073911  (E TERENCE [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2008023250  (SPORTS PRODUCTION COMPANY LTD [NZ]; MORRISON JOSEPH PAUL [NZ]; MUENDER) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[Y]US2011305369  (BENTLEY MICHAEL ET AL.);
 [Y]KR20020007511  (ALPHATELECOM CO.,LTD., YOO, HYEON JOONG);
 [A]KR20090079722  (LG ELECTRONICS INC.);
 [A]US2004075738  (SEAN BURKE ET AL.)
by applicantUS2004096085
 US2011305369
 KR20020007511