blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2795473


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
01.12.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  03.01.2018  [2018/01]
22.08.2017 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
27.02.2017 Change - representative
04.02.2017 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
20.01.2016 Amendment by applicant
14.12.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.06.2015 Change - classification published on  22.07.2015  [2015/30]
19.06.2015 Change - classification published on  22.07.2015  [2015/30]
19.06.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  22.07.2015  [2015/30]
27.02.2015 Change - extension states published on  01.04.2015  [2015/14]
16.12.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.09.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  29.10.2014  [2014/44]
26.09.2014 Request for examination filed published on  29.10.2014  [2014/44]
13.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
06.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
23.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
16.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
16.05.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.05.2014 Amendment by applicant
12.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
09.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
29.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication