blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2795473
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2013095566Global Dossier 27.06.2013A1
Priority number Date
WO2011US67016 22.12.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10019574Global Dossier 10.07.2018B2
US2017235953 17.08.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201313976378 26.06.2013
US201615391702 27.12.2016
WO2011US67016 22.12.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9529805Global Dossier 27.12.2016B2
US2013275479 17.10.2013A1
Priority number Date
WO2011US67016 22.12.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2795473Global Dossier 22.07.2015A4
EP2795473 29.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2011US67016 22.12.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
TWI610182B 01.01.2018B
TW201337589 16.09.2013A
Priority number Date
WO2011US67016 22.12.2011