Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2795473

EP2795473 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PROVIDING DYNAMIC FILE SYSTEM AWARENESS ON STORAGE DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.12.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.01.2018  [2018/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[2014/44]
Inventor(s)01 / THADIKARAN, Paul, J.
11964 Muldoon Wy.
Rancho Cordova, California 95742 / US
02 / TRIANTAFILLOU, Nicholas, D.
4133 SW 41st Pl.
Portland, Oregon 97221 / US
03 / SAXENA, Paritosh
11958 NW Permian Ct.
Portland, Oregon 97229 / US
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Fountain Precinct
Balm Green
Sheffield S1 2JA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/44]Jennings, Vincent Louis
HGF Limited
Fountain Precinct
Balm Green
Sheffield S1 2JA / GB
Application number, filing date11878131.922.12.2011
WO2011US67016
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013095566
Date:27.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2795473
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR27.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F13/14, G06F12/00, G06F3/06
[2015/30]
Former International [2014/44]G06F13/14, G06F12/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR SENSIBILISIERUNG FÜR DYNAMISCHE DATEISYSTEME AUF SPEICHERVORRICHTUNGEN[2014/44]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PROVIDING DYNAMIC FILE SYSTEM AWARENESS ON STORAGE DEVICES[2014/44]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DESTINÉS À FOURNIR UNE RECONNAISSANCE DU SYSTÈME DE FICHIERS DYNAMIQUES DANS LES DISPOSITIFS DE STOCKAGE[2014/44]
Entry into regional phase12.05.2014National basic fee paid 
12.05.2014Search fee paid 
12.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
12.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
14.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.07.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/01]
23.08.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2018/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201606   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2010154062  (BARAM ELAD [IL], et al) [X] 1,2,5-9,12,13 * paragraphs [0010] , [0 13] , [0016] , [0017] , [0019] , [0030] , [0031] , [0033] - [0035] - [0038] - [0041] - [0045] , [0047] - [0049]; figures 2,3,4,5 * [I] 3,4,10,11,14,15
International search[A]US2010083381  (KHOSRAVI HORMUZD M [US], et al);
 [A]US2004236960  (ZIMMER VINCENT J [US], et al);
 [A]US7069594  (BOLIN CHRISTOPHER [US]);
 [A]US2011047618  (EVANS DAVID E [US], et al)
by applicantUS2010154062