Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2795721

EP2795721 - AN APPARATUS COMPRISING AN ANTENNA AND A GROUND PLANE, AND A METHOD OF MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.06.2019
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.07.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Technologies Oy
Karaportti 3
02610 Espoo / FI
[2015/32]
Former [2014/44]For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / SAXE, Christian
Indiakaj 11
5.mf.
DK-2100 Copenhagen East / DK
02 / HANSEN, Martin Feilberg
Kingosgade 11
3 sal
5.mf.
DK-1818 Frederiksberg C / DK
03 / LINDÉN, Olle Henrik
Gyavagen 38a
DK-23637 Hollviken / DK
04 / VISTISEN, Rasmus
Halvtolv 20 st. Tv.
DK-1436 København K / DK
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Swindell & Pearson Limited
48 Friar Gate
Derby DE1 1GY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/44]Higgin, Paul
Swindell & Pearson Limited
48 Friar Gate
Derby DE1 1GY / GB
Application number, filing date11878175.622.12.2011
[2018/32]
WO2011IB55906
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013093563
Date:27.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2795721
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2795721
Date:08.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE27.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:H01Q1/24, H01Q1/40, H01Q9/42, H01Q21/28, H01Q1/02
[2015/43]
Former International [2014/44]H01Q1/24
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG, BESTEHEND AUS EINER ANTENNE UND EINER GRUNDPLATTE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2014/44]
English:AN APPARATUS COMPRISING AN ANTENNA AND A GROUND PLANE, AND A METHOD OF MANUFACTURE[2014/44]
French:APPAREIL COMPRENANT UNE ANTENNE ET UN PLAN DE MASSE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION[2014/44]
Entry into regional phase04.07.2014National basic fee paid 
04.07.2014Search fee paid 
04.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
04.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
05.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.02.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.06.2018Fee for grant paid
29.06.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.06.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP18180935.1  / EP3401997
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.02.2018
Opposition(s)09.05.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL08.08.2018
AT08.08.2018
CZ08.08.2018
DK08.08.2018
EE08.08.2018
ES08.08.2018
FI08.08.2018
HR08.08.2018
IT08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
LV08.08.2018
MC08.08.2018
PL08.08.2018
RO08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
SE08.08.2018
SI08.08.2018
SK08.08.2018
SM08.08.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
LU22.12.2018
[2019/40]
Former [2019/39]AL08.08.2018
AT08.08.2018
CZ08.08.2018
DK08.08.2018
EE08.08.2018
ES08.08.2018
FI08.08.2018
HR08.08.2018
IT08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
LV08.08.2018
PL08.08.2018
RO08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
SE08.08.2018
SI08.08.2018
SK08.08.2018
SM08.08.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
LU22.12.2018
Former [2019/37]AL08.08.2018
AT08.08.2018
CZ08.08.2018
DK08.08.2018
EE08.08.2018
ES08.08.2018
FI08.08.2018
HR08.08.2018
IT08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
LV08.08.2018
PL08.08.2018
RO08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
SE08.08.2018
SI08.08.2018
SK08.08.2018
SM08.08.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/26]AL08.08.2018
AT08.08.2018
CZ08.08.2018
DK08.08.2018
EE08.08.2018
ES08.08.2018
FI08.08.2018
HR08.08.2018
IT08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
LV08.08.2018
PL08.08.2018
RO08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
SE08.08.2018
SK08.08.2018
SM08.08.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/23]AL08.08.2018
AT08.08.2018
CZ08.08.2018
EE08.08.2018
ES08.08.2018
FI08.08.2018
HR08.08.2018
IT08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
LV08.08.2018
PL08.08.2018
RO08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
SE08.08.2018
SK08.08.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/22]AL08.08.2018
AT08.08.2018
CZ08.08.2018
FI08.08.2018
HR08.08.2018
IT08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
LV08.08.2018
PL08.08.2018
RO08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
SE08.08.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/21]AL08.08.2018
AT08.08.2018
FI08.08.2018
HR08.08.2018
IT08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
LV08.08.2018
PL08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
SE08.08.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL08.08.2018
AT08.08.2018
FI08.08.2018
HR08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
LV08.08.2018
PL08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
SE08.08.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/11]AT08.08.2018
FI08.08.2018
HR08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
PL08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
SE08.08.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/10]AT08.08.2018
FI08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
PL08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
SE08.08.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
NO08.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT08.08.2018
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1873863  (CASIO HITACHI MOBILE COMM CO [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0044]; figures 2-6 *;
 [A]WO2010025023  (MOTOROLA INC [US]; WOJACK JASON P [US]; ALLORE JOSEPH L [US]; WEISS GA) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]EP2262053  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0032]; figures 5A-C, 6 *
International search[A]US4123756  (NAGATA KOICHI ET AL);
 [A]US2010039347  (CHEN HSIN-YI ET AL);
 [A]GB2439601  (NOKIA CORP)