Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2795916

EP2795916 - USER BEHAVIOR BASED DATA POPULATION OF DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.12.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  31.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.12.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.01.2018  [2018/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[2014/44]
Inventor(s)01 / FAULKNER, Susan Alice
2338 NW Hoyt Street
Portland, OR 97210 / US
02 / BOURDONNEC, Françoise
7050 SW 68th Ave
Portland, OR 97223 / US
03 / WOUHAYBI, Rita, H.
16046 NW Trakehner Way
Portland, Oregon 97229 / US
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Rummler, Felix
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/44]Rummler, Felix
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co
26 Caxton Street
London, SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date11878213.521.12.2011
WO2011US66552
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013095446
Date:27.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2795916
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR27.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04N21/45, H04N21/462, H04N21/442, H04N21/24, H04N21/258, H04N21/466, H04N21/482
[2015/32]
Former International [2014/44]H04N21/45, H04N21/462
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
TitleGerman:AUF EINEM BENUTZERVERHALTEN BERUHENDE DATENWEITERLEITUNG IN VORRICHTUNGEN[2014/44]
English:USER BEHAVIOR BASED DATA POPULATION OF DEVICES[2014/44]
French:REMPLISSAGE DE DISPOSITIFS AVEC DES DONNÉES SUR LA BASE DU COMPORTEMENT D'UN UTILISATEUR[2014/44]
Entry into regional phase14.05.2014National basic fee paid 
14.05.2014Search fee paid 
14.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
14.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
29.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.04.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.08.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/03]
12.09.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/03]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.04.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]EP2276253  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-16 * paragraphs [0008] , [0 14] , [0 16] , [0 36] * * figures 1-7 *;
 [X]US2003182567  (BARTON JAMES M [US] ET AL) [X] 1-16 * paragraphs [0017] - [0020] * * figures 1-12 *;
 [X]US2009055385  (JEON JOON-HEE [US] ET AL) [X] 1-16 * paragraphs [0041] , [0 44] , [0 91] * * figures 1, 5 *;
 [X]US2003149981  (FINSTER PAUL [US] ET AL) [X] 1-16 * paragraphs [0006] - [0008] * * figures 3-6 *;
 [A]US2010122293  (CRANER MICHAEL [US]) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0029] *;
 [A]US2005278741  (ROBARTS JAMES O [US] ET AL) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0019] - [0022] * * figures 1-15 *
International search[Y]US2008259906  (SHKEDI ROY);
 [Y]US2003229629  (RADU S. JASINSCHI ET AL.);
 [A]US2004117828  (BENJAMIN JAMES PARKER ET AL.);
 [A]US2006090184  (DAVID ZITO ET AL.)
by applicantEP2276253
 US2003182567
 US2009055385
 US2003149981