Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2796538

EP2796538 - OBJECT SELECTING DEVICE AND OBJECT SELECTING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.02.2018
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.03.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip09.11.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GB
published on 12.12.2018  [2018/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha
2500 Shingai
Iwata-shi
Shizuoka-ken 438-8501 / JP
[2014/44]
Inventor(s)01 / ITO, Saburo
c/o Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha
2500 Shingai
Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken 438-8501 / JP
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[2017/16]
Former [2014/44]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
Application number, filing date11878294.520.12.2011
[2017/16]
WO2011JP07115
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013093961
Date:27.06.2013
Language:JA
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2796538
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2796538
Date:19.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP27.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.12.2014
ClassificationInternational:C12M1/34, C12Q1/02
[2014/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:OBJEKTAUSWAHLVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR OBJEKTAUSWAHL[2014/44]
English:OBJECT SELECTING DEVICE AND OBJECT SELECTING METHOD[2014/44]
French:DISPOSITIF DE SÉLECTION D'OBJETS ET PROCÉDÉ DE SÉLECTION D'OBJETS[2014/44]
Entry into regional phase08.07.2014Translation filed 
10.07.2014National basic fee paid 
10.07.2014Search fee paid 
10.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
10.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.09.2012Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
10.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
29.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.12.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.03.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.04.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.07.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.09.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
14.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.12.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.03.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
09.03.2017Fee for grant paid
09.03.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.12.2015
Opposition(s)22.01.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
22.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
22.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
23.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.04.2017
CZ19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
EE19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
HR19.04.2017
IT19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RO19.04.2017
RS19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
SI19.04.2017
SK19.04.2017
SM19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
NO19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
GB20.12.2017
IE20.12.2017
LU20.12.2017
MT20.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
FR02.01.2018
[2018/50]
Former [2018/49]AT19.04.2017
CZ19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
EE19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
HR19.04.2017
IT19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RO19.04.2017
RS19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
SI19.04.2017
SK19.04.2017
SM19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
NO19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
IE20.12.2017
LU20.12.2017
MT20.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
FR02.01.2018
Former [2018/45]AT19.04.2017
CZ19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
EE19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
HR19.04.2017
IT19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RO19.04.2017
RS19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
SI19.04.2017
SK19.04.2017
SM19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
NO19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
IE20.12.2017
LU20.12.2017
MT20.12.2017
Former [2018/43]AT19.04.2017
CZ19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
EE19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
HR19.04.2017
IT19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RO19.04.2017
RS19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
SI19.04.2017
SK19.04.2017
SM19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
NO19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
LU20.12.2017
MT20.12.2017
Former [2018/25]AT19.04.2017
CZ19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
EE19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
HR19.04.2017
IT19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RO19.04.2017
RS19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
SI19.04.2017
SK19.04.2017
SM19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
NO19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
Former [2018/11]AT19.04.2017
CZ19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
EE19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
HR19.04.2017
IT19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RO19.04.2017
RS19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
SK19.04.2017
SM19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
NO19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
Former [2018/10]AT19.04.2017
CZ19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
EE19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
HR19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RO19.04.2017
RS19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
SK19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
NO19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
Former [2018/09]AT19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
EE19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
HR19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RS19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
NO19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
Former [2017/50]AT19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
HR19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RS19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
NO19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
Former [2017/49]AT19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
HR19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
NO19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
Former [2017/48]NL19.04.2017
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2011103143  (UNIV NORTH CAROLINA [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * abstract; figures 1, 2, 3, 5, 7, 14; whole document * [I] 13;
 [E]EP2796538  (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-13 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0119]; figures 1, 3, 4, 11, 12, 13 *;
 [A]WO0196019  (HOUMMADY MOUSSA [FR]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2006128006  (GERHARDT ANTIMONY L [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * figure 5 *;
 [A]WO2007022026  (BIOTROVE INC [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *
 [XI]  - YULI WANG ET AL, "Micromolded arrays for separation of adherent cells", LAB ON A CHIP, (20100101), vol. 10, no. 21, doi:10.1039/c0lc00186d, ISSN 1473-0197, page 2917, XP055156586 [X] 1-12 * abstract * * the whole document * [I] 13

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c0lc00186d
International search[X]JP2009504161  (BIOTROVE, INC.);
 [X]JP2004510996  (BIOTROVE, INC.);
 [A]JP2007504816  (OVATURE RESEARCH INC.);
 [A]JP2004503389  (HOUMMADY, MOUSSA);
 [A]JP2008504816  (CYTORI THERAPEUTICS, INC.)
by applicantJP2009504161
 JPH05103658