Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2798629

EP2798629 - REDUCING THE NUMBER OF SCALING ENGINES USED IN A DISPLAY CONTROLLER TO DISPLAY A PLURALITY OF IMAGES ON A SCREEN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.01.2019
Database last updated on 14.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.05.2019New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[2014/45]
Inventor(s)01 / ZHANG, Wujian
1209 Lynn Way
Sunnyvale, California 94087 / US
02 / KURUPATI, Sreenath
914 Bluebell Way
Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date11878406.529.12.2011
WO2011US67728
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013101023
Date:04.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2798629
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013
[2014/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR04.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:G09G5/36, H04N5/46
[2015/32]
Former International [2014/45]G09G5/36
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
TitleGerman:VERRINGERUNG DER ANZAHL VON SKALIERUNGSMOTOREN BEI EINER ANZEIGESTEUERUNG ZUR ANZEIGE VON MEHREREN BILDERN AUF EINEM BILDSCHIRM[2014/45]
English:REDUCING THE NUMBER OF SCALING ENGINES USED IN A DISPLAY CONTROLLER TO DISPLAY A PLURALITY OF IMAGES ON A SCREEN[2014/45]
French:RÉDUCTION DU NOMBRE DE MOTEURS DE MISE À L'ÉCHELLE DANS UNE UNITÉ DE COMMANDE D'AFFICHAGE POUR AFFICHER PLUSIEURS IMAGES SUR UN ÉCRAN[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase09.06.2014National basic fee paid 
09.06.2014Search fee paid 
09.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
09.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
21.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.01.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
20.05.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.01.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201808   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2007139559  (NEUMAN DARREN [US]) [X] 1-3,5,7,8,10-12,14,15 * figures 1b,9 * [I] 4,6,9,13;
 [A]WO0028518  (BROADCOM CORP [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 4,25,27 *
International search[X]KR100649891B  (IDIS [KR]);
 [A]US2009295834  (MACINNIS ALEXANDER G [US], et al);
 [A]US2009225224  (SUNG YU-YU [TW], et al)
by applicantUS2007139559