Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2798454 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2798454



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 175
15.01.2019 Miscellaneous requests concerning client data Search / examination 1
12.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.12.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
12.12.2018 Annex Search / examination 2
12.12.2018 Claims Search / examination 3
12.12.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
12.12.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
11.12.2018 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
05.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.12.2018 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.07.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
26.07.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
20.07.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
02.03.2017 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
22.02.2017 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 4
15.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
15.02.2017 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
15.02.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
15.02.2017 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
15.02.2017 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
15.02.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
05.08.2016 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
20.07.2016 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
20.07.2016 European search opinion Search / examination 5
20.07.2016 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
20.07.2016 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
12.07.2016 Search started Search / examination 1
08.10.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
16.09.2014 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
08.09.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
06.08.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
04.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
29.07.2014 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
24.07.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
17.07.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
30.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.06.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.06.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
26.06.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
25.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
25.06.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
25.06.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 7
25.06.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
09.05.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
04.07.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
04.07.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 75