Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2798454


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
19.12.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
15.12.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.12.2018 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
06.08.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
27.07.2018 First examination report
15.12.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.02.2017 Change - representative
17.02.2017 Amendment by applicant
16.12.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.07.2016 Change - classification published on  17.08.2016  [2016/33]
15.07.2016 Change - classification published on  17.08.2016  [2016/33]
15.07.2016 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  17.08.2016  [2016/33]
14.12.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.03.2015 Change - extension states published on  08.04.2015  [2015/15]
16.12.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.11.2014  [2014/45]
03.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  05.11.2014  [2014/45]
13.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
22.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
18.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
29.06.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.06.2014 Amendment by applicant
26.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
19.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
05.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication