Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2798454

EP2798454 - SIMD VARIABLE SHIFT AND ROTATE USING CONTROL MANIPULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.07.2018
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.12.2018New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[2014/45]
Inventor(s)01 / RUBENSTEIN, Asaf
14A Pinkster Street
63421 Tel-Aviv / IL
02 / AVIRAM, Tom
26th Pombadita Street
64234 Tel-Aviv / IL
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Fountain Precinct
Balm Green
Sheffield S1 2JA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]Hufton, David Alan
HGF Limited
Fountain Precinct
Balm Green
Sheffield S1 2JA / GB
Application number, filing date11878419.830.12.2011
WO2011US68148
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013101198
Date:04.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2798454
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013
[2014/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR04.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.07.2016
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/06, G06F9/30, G06F9/305, G06F9/38
[2016/33]
Former International [2014/45]G06F9/06, G06F9/30, G06F9/305
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
TitleGerman:VARIABLE SIMD-VERSCHIEBUNG UND -DREHUNG UNTER ANWENDUNG EINER STEUERMANIPULATION[2014/45]
English:SIMD VARIABLE SHIFT AND ROTATE USING CONTROL MANIPULATION[2014/45]
French:DÉCALAGE ET ROTATION VARIABLES DE SIMD À L'AIDE D'UNE MANIPULATION DE COMMANDE[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase25.06.2014National basic fee paid 
25.06.2014Search fee paid 
25.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
25.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
15.02.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.12.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.07.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XI]US5379240  (BYRNE JEFFREY S [US]) [X] 1,2,4-16 * column 3, line 44 - line l; figure 2 * * column 4, line 1 - line 35; figure 3 * * column 4, line 36 - column 5, line 52; figures 4a-4c * [I] 3;
 [A]US6675182  (HOFSTEE H PETER [US] ET AL) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *
International search[A]US2009300323  (HESSEL, RICHARD ET AL.);
 [A]US2005125638  (FORD, SIMON ET AL.);
 [A]US7689811  (DIJKSTRA, WILCO ET AL.);
 [A]US5859790  (SIDWELL, NATHAN MACKENZIE)