Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2798522

EP2798522 - SELECTIVE HARDWARE ACCELERATION IN VIDEO PLAYBACK SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.02.2017
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.02.2019New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[2014/45]
Inventor(s)01 / HU, Ningxin
Room 301
Building 85
486 Anning Rd.
Minghang District
Shanghai 200240 / CN
02 / LE, Yongnian
1303RM. Humin Rd.
Shanghai 200233 / CN
03 / DENG, Xuefeng
No. 880 Zixing Road
Zizhu Science Park
Shanghai 200241 / CN
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date11878540.130.12.2011
WO2011CN84982
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013097163
Date:04.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2798522
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013
[2014/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN04.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/00, G06F17/30, G06T1/20, H04N21/426
[2015/32]
Former International [2014/45]G06F17/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
TitleGerman:SELEKTIVE HARDWAREBESCHLEUNIGUNG IN VIDEO-WIEDERGABESYSTEMEN[2014/45]
English:SELECTIVE HARDWARE ACCELERATION IN VIDEO PLAYBACK SYSTEMS[2014/45]
French:ACCÉLÉRATION MATÉRIELLE SÉLECTIVE DANS DES SYSTÈMES DE LECTURE VIDÉO[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase24.06.2014National basic fee paid 
24.06.2014Search fee paid 
24.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
24.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
22.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.10.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.04.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.10.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201808   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2009228782  (FRASER SIMON [US]) [X] 1,2,5-9,13-15 * the whole document * [I] 3,4,10-12;
 [XI]US2008120626  (GRAFFAGNINO PETER [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-9,13-15 * the whole document * [I] 3,4,10-12;
 [A]US2009080802  (SHUTO EITA [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[X]US2009228782  (FRASER SIMON [US]);
 [A]US2010245584  (MINASYAN JOHN R [US], et al);
 [A]US2011221959  (BEN YEHUDA RAZ [IL], et al);
 [A]CN102147923  (XINQUAN LI)