Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2800026

EP2800026 - HARDWARE AND SOFTWARE SYSTEM FOR APPLYING AND READING INFORMATION FIELDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.08.2016
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.08.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.09.2016  [2016/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pryakhin, Evgeniy Ivanovich
Ul. Lenina 20-93
St.Petersburg 197136 / RU
For all designated states
Larionova, Ekaterina Vladimirovna
Ul. Marshala Kazakova d.24 korp.2 kv.228
St.Petersburg 198332 / RU
For all designated states
Zaharenko, Evgeniy Anatolevich
Ul. Shavrova 9/41
St.Petersburg 197373 / RU
[2014/45]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
[2014/45]
Application number, filing date11878588.029.12.2011
WO2011RU01062
Filing languageRU
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013100794
Date:04.07.2013
Language:RU
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2800026
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:RU04.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.08.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06K1/12
[2014/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
TitleGerman:HARDWARE- UND SOFTWARESYSTEM ZUM ANWENDEN UND LESEN VON INFORMATIONSFELDERN[2014/45]
English:HARDWARE AND SOFTWARE SYSTEM FOR APPLYING AND READING INFORMATION FIELDS[2014/45]
French:COMPLEXE MATÉRIEL-LOGICIEL POUR APPLIQUER ET LIRE DES CHAMPS D'INFORMATIONS[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase28.07.2014Translation filed 
28.07.2014National basic fee paid 
28.07.2014Search fee paid 
28.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
28.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
28.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
19.03.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/39]
29.04.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
24.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201404   M06   Fee paid on   24.03.2015
31.12.201505   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2010253760  (AUDOUARD ERIC [FR] ET AL) [X] 1-4,7,9 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0087] * * paragraph [0108] * * figures 1,5a,5b * [I] 5,6,8;
 [IA]WO9904364  (ASSURE SYSTEMS INC [US]; DOLJACK FRANK A [US]) [I] 1-3,5-7,9 * abstract * * page 2, line 26 - page 3, line 10 * * page 10, line 3 - page 12, line 12 * * page 14, line 19 - line 23 * * page 17, line 6 - page 19, line 4 * * claims 1,10-17 * * figures 1,8,9 * [A] 4,8
International search[Y]US2006196858  (BARRON WES [CA], et al);
 [Y]RU2408929  (SHKILEV VLADIMIR DMITRIEVICH [RU])
 [Y]  - "Novy lazerny markirator Videojet 3320 - vysokaya skorost i nadezhnaya rabota, otraslevoi portal", UNIPACK., RU, (20060504), URL: http://press.unipack.ru/14935, (20120905), XP055157839
by applicantRU2199781
 RU48399U
 RU2281552