Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2800051

EP2800051 - INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, INFORMATION PROCESSING PROGRAM AND RECORDING MEDIUM WITH INFORMATION PROCESSING PROGRAM RECORDED THEREON [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.11.2017
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rakuten, Inc.
1-14-1, Tamagawa
Setagaya-ku
Tokyo 158-0094 / JP
[2015/45]
Former [2014/45]For all designated states
Rakuten, Inc.
4-12-3, Higashishinagawa Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 140-0002 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / YOSHIOKA Takumi
c/o Rakuten Inc.
4-12-3 Higashishinagawa
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 140-0002 / JP
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)EIP
EIP Europe LLP
Fairfax House
15 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]EIP
Fairfax House
15 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HU / GB
Application number, filing date11878602.928.12.2011
WO2011JP80437
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013099003
Date:04.07.2013
Language:JA
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2800051
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP04.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06Q10/02, G06Q50/14, G06Q30/02, G06Q50/10
[2015/36]
Former International [2014/45]G06Q50/14, G06Q30/02, G06Q50/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
TitleGerman:INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSPROGRAMM UND AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM MIT DEM DARAUF AUFGEZEICHNETEN INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSPROGRAMM[2014/45]
English:INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, INFORMATION PROCESSING PROGRAM AND RECORDING MEDIUM WITH INFORMATION PROCESSING PROGRAM RECORDED THEREON[2014/45]
French:DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, PROGRAMME DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT AVEC PROGRAMME DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ENREGISTRÉ SUR CELUI-CI[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase24.06.2014Translation filed 
24.06.2014National basic fee paid 
24.06.2014Search fee paid 
24.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
24.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
26.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.11.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.03.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.11.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
22.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
22.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
23.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
28.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
31.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0788067  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-22 * abstract * * column 2, line 16 - column 5, line 27 *;
 [X]JP2008045967  (ZANAVY INFORMATICS KK) [X] 1-22 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5549332  (JUDSON NANCY L [US]) [X] 1-22 * abstract * * column 2, line 29 - column 5, line 8 *;
 [X]JP4777476B  (TOSHIBA CORP; TOSHIBA SOLUTIONS CORP) [X] 1-22 * the whole document *;
 []EP2613272  (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) [ ] * the whole document *
International search[X]JP2010033169  (TOSHIBA SOLUTIONS CORP, et al);
 [Y]JP2004185461  (RECRUIT CO LTD, et al);
 [A]JP2003139553  (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE);
 [A]JP2003248713  (MAZDA MOTOR);
 [A]JP2008045967  (ZANAVY INFORMATICS KK);
 [A]JP2002054940  (ALPINE ELECTRONICS INC)
by applicantJP2002203012