Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2798561

EP2798561 - BIOMETRIC CLOUD COMMUNICATION AND DATA MOVEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.06.2018
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.07.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.07.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.06.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[2014/45]
Inventor(s)01 / REYNOLDS, Derek J.
3015 Hammond Way
El Dorado Hills, California 95762 / US
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Rummler, Felix
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2017/33]
Former [2014/45]Rummler, Felix
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date11878670.629.12.2011
[2017/33]
WO2011US67833
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013101056
Date:04.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2798561
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013
[2014/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2798561
Date:16.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR04.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.08.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F21/30, G06F15/16, G06K9/20, H04W12/06, G06F21/32, G06F21/60, H04L29/06, // H04L29/08
[2015/37]
Former International [2014/45]G06F21/30, G06F15/16, G06K9/20
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:BIOMETRISCHE CLOUD-KOMMUNIKATION UND DATENBEWEGUNG[2014/45]
English:BIOMETRIC CLOUD COMMUNICATION AND DATA MOVEMENT[2014/45]
French:COMMUNICATION EN NUAGE BIOMÉTRIQUE ET MOUVEMENT DE DONNÉES[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase09.06.2014National basic fee paid 
09.06.2014Search fee paid 
09.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
09.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
02.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.09.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.06.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
16.06.2017Fee for grant paid
16.06.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.07.2017Information about intention to grant a patent
07.07.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP17186220.4  / EP3270311
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.05.2016
Opposition(s)17.05.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU29.12.2011
AT16.08.2017
CY16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
HR16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
MC16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SI16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
FI29.12.2017
IE29.12.2017
LU29.12.2017
MT29.12.2017
SE30.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
[2019/47]
Former [2019/31]HU29.12.2011
AT16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
HR16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
MC16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SI16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
FI29.12.2017
IE29.12.2017
LU29.12.2017
MT29.12.2017
SE30.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
Former [2019/30]AT16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
HR16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
MC16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SI16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
FI29.12.2017
IE29.12.2017
LU29.12.2017
MT29.12.2017
SE30.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
Former [2018/52]AT16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
HR16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SI16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
FI29.12.2017
IE29.12.2017
LU29.12.2017
MT29.12.2017
SE30.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
Former [2018/50]AT16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
HR16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SI16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
FI29.12.2017
IE29.12.2017
LU29.12.2017
MT29.12.2017
SE30.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
Former [2018/45]AT16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
HR16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SI16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
FI29.12.2017
IE29.12.2017
LU29.12.2017
MT29.12.2017
SE30.12.2017
Former [2018/43]AT16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
HR16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SI16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
FI29.12.2017
LU29.12.2017
MT29.12.2017
SE30.12.2017
Former [2018/39]AT16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
HR16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SI16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
FI29.12.2017
SE30.12.2017
Former [2018/36]AT16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
HR16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
FI29.12.2017
Former [2018/24]AT16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
HR16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/23]AT16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
HR16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/21]AT16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
HR16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/12]AT16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
HR16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/11]AT16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
HR16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/10]AT16.08.2017
HR16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
NO16.11.2017
Former [2018/07]LT16.08.2017
NO16.11.2017
Documents cited:Search[XI]US7519558  (BALLARD CLAUDIO R [US] ET AL) [X] 1-4,6-10,12 * abstract * * columns 3,11,12 * * column 16 - column 18 * [I] 5,11;
 [XI]US2004073803  (KERAMANE CHERIF [US]) [X] 1-4,6-10,12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0027] , [0031] , [0034] - paragraphs [0037] , [0051] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0044] * [I] 5,11;
 [A]US2004177097  (YU YUAN-PIN [US] ET AL) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] , [0014] , [0022] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraphs [0036] , [0040] , [0046] , [0055] - paragraph [0069] *
International search[X]US2004073803  (CHERIF KERAMANE);
 [A]US2005246763  (PETER CORCORAN ET AL.);
 [A]US2010299313  (ORSINI RICK L. ET AL.);
 [A]US2008091613  (WILLIAM H. GATES, ET AL.)
by applicantUS7519558
 US2004073803