Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2800247

EP2800247 - MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  22.07.2016
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.07.2016Deletion: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
22.07.2016Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 24.08.2016  [2016/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki
2-1, Kurosaki-shiroishi Yahatanishi-ku
Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP
[2014/45]
Inventor(s)01 / HOSHI Toshiyuki
c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA YASKAWA DENKI
2-1 Kurosaki-Shiroishi
Yahatanishi-ku
Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP
02 / WATANABE Kenji
c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA YASKAWA DENKI
2-1 Kurosaki-Shiroishi
Yahatanishi-ku
Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Brauhaus 8
01099 Dresden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]Viering, Jentschura & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Grillparzerstrasse 14
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date11878688.827.12.2011
WO2011JP80243
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013098949
Date:04.07.2013
Language:JA
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2800247
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP04.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:H02K3/18, H02K41/03, H02K3/28
[2015/36]
Former International [2014/45]H02K3/18, H02K41/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
TitleGerman:MOTOR[2014/45]
English:MOTOR[2014/45]
French:MOTEUR[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase19.06.2014Translation filed 
19.06.2014National basic fee paid 
19.06.2014Search fee paid 
19.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
19.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
18.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.07.2016Application withdrawn by applicant  [2016/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
30.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
29.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5642013  (WAVRE NICOLAS [CH]) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * column 3, line 59 - column 4, line 29 * * column 6, line 49 - line 59 * * figures 4,8,9 *;
 [Y]US3466480  (BUNNER JAMES E ET AL) [Y] 1-5 * column 1, line 36 - column 3, line 7 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US2010013327  (HOPPE THOMAS [DE]) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * * figure - *;
 [A]US2394075  (KIMBALL ALBERT W) [A] 1-5 * page 1, column 2, line 1 - line 21 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US2011169369  (LIANG FENG [US] ET AL) [A] 1-5 * abstract *
International search[Y]JP2005261117  (HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD.);
 [Y]JP2004260985  (SANKYO SEIKI MFG. CO., LTD.);
 [A]JP2008211918  (KOKUSAN DENKI CO., LTD.)
by applicantJP4304999B