Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2800247


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
22.07.2016 Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
22.07.2016 Withdrawal of application published on  24.08.2016  [2016/34]
21.07.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
08.07.2016 Change - classification published on  10.08.2016  [2016/32]
08.07.2016 Change - classification published on  10.08.2016  [2016/32]
07.06.2016 Change - representative
19.02.2016 Amendment by applicant
11.01.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.07.2015 Change - classification published on  02.09.2015  [2015/36]
31.07.2015 Change - classification published on  02.09.2015  [2015/36]
31.07.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  02.09.2015  [2015/36]
06.03.2015 Change - extension states published on  08.04.2015  [2015/15]
13.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.11.2014  [2014/45]
03.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  05.11.2014  [2014/45]
25.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
05.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
24.06.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
20.06.2014 Amendment by applicant
18.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
05.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication