Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2798460

EP2798460 - VIDEO ENCODING IN VIDEO ANALYTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.08.2017
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.08.2019New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[2014/45]
Inventor(s)01 / MISHRA, Animesh
868 Hopkins Way
Pleasanton, California 94566 / US
02 / RODRIGUEZ, Jose M.
2067 Emory Street
San Jose, California 95128 / US
03 / DODDAPUNENI, Naveen
1829 E. Beautiful Lane
Phoenix, Arizona 85042 / US
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date11878702.728.12.2011
WO2011US67449
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013100920
Date:04.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2798460
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013
[2014/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR04.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.04.2016
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/06, G06F9/46, G06F13/14, G06F13/38
[2014/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
TitleGerman:VIDEOKODIERUNG IN VIDEOANALYSEN[2014/45]
English:VIDEO ENCODING IN VIDEO ANALYTICS[2014/45]
French:CODAGE DE CONTENU VIDÉO DANS DES ANALYSES DE CONTENU VIDÉO[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase28.05.2014National basic fee paid 
28.05.2014Search fee paid 
28.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
28.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
24.10.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.08.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.11.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.07.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.08.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201808   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2006176955  (LU PAUL Y [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,6,7,12,13 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0046] * [Y] 3-5,8-11,14,15;
 [X]US7126992  (CHIANG PATRICIA WEI YIN [SG] ET AL) [X] 1,2,6,7,12,13 * column 8, line 50 - line 64 *;
 [Y]EP0348113  (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC [US]) [Y] 3-5,8-11,14,15 * page 12, line 28 - line 55 *;
 [A]  - GUOHUA WEI ET AL, "Design and Implementation of an IP-Based Intelligent Video Surveillance System", SIGNAL PROCESSING, THE 8TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PI, (20060101), ISBN 978-0-7803-9736-1, XP031058751 [A] 1-15 * page 4; figures 5,6 *
International search[X]US7126992  (PARTRICIA WEI YIN CHIANG ET AL.);
 [A]US2006176955  (PAUL LU ET AL.);
 [A]US6535217  (CHIH; DAVID ET AL.);
 [A]US6862318  (TETSUYA MATSUMURA ET AL.)