Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2799112

EP2799112 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR FORMING BEAM FOR ENHANCING BEAM-FORMING RESOLUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.09.2016
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.11.2016  [2016/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alpinion Medical Systems Co., Ltd.
112-83, Annyeong-dong
Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do 445-380 / KR
[2014/45]
Inventor(s)01 / KIM, Dae Seung
353-58 Hwagok 1-dong
Gangseo-gu
Seoul 157-882 / KR
02 / SON, Keonho
804-1503 SanunMaeul 8 Danji.
Unjung-dong
Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-970 / KR
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Thorniley, Peter , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]Thorniley, Peter , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date11878766.229.12.2011
WO2011KR10338
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013100235
Date:04.07.2013
Language:KO
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2799112
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR04.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61N7/02, A61B8/08, G01S15/89, G01S7/52, G10K11/34, // A61B19/00
[2015/45]
Former International [2014/45]A61N7/00, A61B18/04, A61B8/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR STRAHLFORMUNG FÜR VERBESSERTE STRAHLFORMUNGSAUFLÖSUNG[2014/45]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR FORMING BEAM FOR ENHANCING BEAM-FORMING RESOLUTION[2014/45]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION DE FAISCEAU POUR AMÉLIORER UNE RÉSOLUTION DE FORMATION DE FAISCEAU[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase29.07.2014Translation filed 
29.07.2014National basic fee paid 
29.07.2014Search fee paid 
29.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
29.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
03.05.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/44]
15.06.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
29.07.201403   M06   Fee paid on   28.08.2014
Documents cited:Search[X]US5142649  (O'DONNELL MATTHEW [US]) [X] 1,3-5 * column 7, line 5 - line 20; figure 2 *;
 [A]US5501655  (ROLT KENNETH D [US] ET AL) [A] 1-9 * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 4 *;
 [A]US6419648  (VITEK SHUKI [IL] ET AL) [A] 1-9 * column 4, line 58 - column 5, line 7; figures 1a,1b *;
 [A]US5573497  (CHAPELON JEAN-YVES [FR]) [A] 1-9 * column 4, line 22 - line 44 *;
 [A]EP0248532  (VARIAN ASSOCIATES [US]) [A] 1-9 * column 6, line 1 - line 15; figures 2,3 * * column 16, line 7 - line 25 *
International search[A]WO2011080631  (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS, N.V.);
 [A]US6007499  (MARTIN, ROY W. ET AL.);
 [A]US2008015435  (CRIBBS, ROBERT ET AL.);
 [A]WO2010006293  (CORNELL UNIVERSITY);
 [A]US6042556  (BEACH, KIRK W. ET AL.)