Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2800323

EP2800323 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DETECTING FSS BY PEAK THRESHOLD, AND RECEIVER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.10.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.11.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
[2017/49]
Former [2014/45]For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / ZHANG, Junling
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Brevalex
95, rue d'Amsterdam
75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR
[2014/45]
Application number, filing date11878857.931.12.2011
[2017/49]
WO2011CN85182
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013097238
Date:04.07.2013
Language:ZH
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2800323
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2800323
Date:06.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN04.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04L27/26
[2017/30]
Former International [2015/33]H04L27/26, H04L7/00
Former International [2014/45]H04L27/26
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ERKENNUNG VON FSS MITTELS SPITZENGRENZWERT UND EMPFÄNGER[2014/45]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DETECTING FSS BY PEAK THRESHOLD, AND RECEIVER[2014/45]
French:PROCÉDÉ, SYSTÈME ET RÉCEPTEUR DE DÉTECTION DE FSS DE SEUILS DE VALEURS DE CRÊTE[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase07.07.2014Translation filed 
07.07.2014National basic fee paid 
07.07.2014Search fee paid 
07.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
07.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
03.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.07.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.10.2017Fee for grant paid
27.10.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.10.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.07.2017
Opposition(s)07.09.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
02.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU31.12.2011
AT06.12.2017
CY06.12.2017
CZ06.12.2017
DK06.12.2017
EE06.12.2017
ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
IT06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
LV06.12.2017
MC06.12.2017
NL06.12.2017
PL06.12.2017
RO06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
SI06.12.2017
SK06.12.2017
SM06.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
IE31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
LU31.12.2017
MT31.12.2017
BG06.03.2018
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
[2019/47]
Former [2019/31]HU31.12.2011
AT06.12.2017
CZ06.12.2017
DK06.12.2017
EE06.12.2017
ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
IT06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
LV06.12.2017
MC06.12.2017
NL06.12.2017
PL06.12.2017
RO06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
SI06.12.2017
SK06.12.2017
SM06.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
IE31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
LU31.12.2017
MT31.12.2017
BG06.03.2018
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
Former [2018/52]AT06.12.2017
CZ06.12.2017
DK06.12.2017
EE06.12.2017
ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
IT06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
LV06.12.2017
MC06.12.2017
NL06.12.2017
PL06.12.2017
RO06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
SI06.12.2017
SK06.12.2017
SM06.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
IE31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
LU31.12.2017
MT31.12.2017
BG06.03.2018
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
Former [2018/51]AT06.12.2017
CZ06.12.2017
DK06.12.2017
EE06.12.2017
ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
IT06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
LV06.12.2017
MC06.12.2017
NL06.12.2017
PL06.12.2017
RO06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
SK06.12.2017
SM06.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
IE31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
LU31.12.2017
MT31.12.2017
BG06.03.2018
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
Former [2018/50]AT06.12.2017
CZ06.12.2017
EE06.12.2017
ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
IT06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
LV06.12.2017
MC06.12.2017
NL06.12.2017
PL06.12.2017
RO06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
SK06.12.2017
SM06.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
IE31.12.2017
LU31.12.2017
MT31.12.2017
BG06.03.2018
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
Former [2018/45]AT06.12.2017
CZ06.12.2017
EE06.12.2017
ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
IT06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
LV06.12.2017
MC06.12.2017
NL06.12.2017
PL06.12.2017
RO06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
SK06.12.2017
SM06.12.2017
IE31.12.2017
LU31.12.2017
MT31.12.2017
BG06.03.2018
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
Former [2018/44]AT06.12.2017
CZ06.12.2017
EE06.12.2017
ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
IT06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
LV06.12.2017
MC06.12.2017
NL06.12.2017
PL06.12.2017
RO06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
SK06.12.2017
SM06.12.2017
LU31.12.2017
MT31.12.2017
BG06.03.2018
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
Former [2018/43]AT06.12.2017
CZ06.12.2017
EE06.12.2017
ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
IT06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
LV06.12.2017
NL06.12.2017
PL06.12.2017
RO06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
SK06.12.2017
SM06.12.2017
LU31.12.2017
MT31.12.2017
BG06.03.2018
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
Former [2018/40]AT06.12.2017
CZ06.12.2017
EE06.12.2017
ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
IT06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
LV06.12.2017
NL06.12.2017
PL06.12.2017
RO06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
SK06.12.2017
SM06.12.2017
BG06.03.2018
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
Former [2018/39]AT06.12.2017
CZ06.12.2017
EE06.12.2017
ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
IT06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
LV06.12.2017
NL06.12.2017
PL06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
SK06.12.2017
SM06.12.2017
BG06.03.2018
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
Former [2018/38]AT06.12.2017
CZ06.12.2017
EE06.12.2017
ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
LV06.12.2017
NL06.12.2017
PL06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
SK06.12.2017
SM06.12.2017
BG06.03.2018
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
Former [2018/37]CZ06.12.2017
EE06.12.2017
ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
LV06.12.2017
NL06.12.2017
PL06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
SK06.12.2017
SM06.12.2017
BG06.03.2018
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
Former [2018/34]ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
LV06.12.2017
NL06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
BG06.03.2018
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
Former [2018/24]ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
LV06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
BG06.03.2018
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
Former [2018/23]ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
Former [2018/22]ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
NO06.03.2018
Documents cited:Search[I]US8031587  (KANG DONG-HYUN [KR]) [I] 1-10 * column 6, line 59 - line 61 * * column 7, line 11 - line 22 * * column 8, line 4 - line 15 * * figure 3 *
International search[A]CN101223753  (NXP B.V.);
 [A]CN101686216  (ALI ELECTRONICS SHANGHAI CO., LTD.);
 [A]CN101848180  (FUDAN UNIVERSITY);
 [A]US2008239941  (ZORAN CORPORATION);
 [A]CN101043503  (HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD.)
ExaminationUS7920599