Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2800323 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2800323



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 158
10.10.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
14.12.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
09.11.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
27.10.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.10.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
27.10.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
27.10.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
10.07.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
10.07.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
10.07.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
10.07.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 17
10.07.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 16
15.06.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
06.03.2017 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
03.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.02.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
03.02.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
03.02.2016 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
03.02.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
03.02.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
03.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
03.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
03.02.2016 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
02.11.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
02.11.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
28.07.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
10.07.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
10.07.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 4
10.07.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
29.06.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
04.06.2015 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
28.11.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
28.11.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
08.10.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
08.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.07.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
17.07.2014 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
07.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
07.07.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
07.07.2014 Claims Search / examination 3
07.07.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
07.07.2014 Description Search / examination 10
07.07.2014 Drawings Search / examination 3
07.07.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
07.07.2014 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
09.05.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
04.07.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
04.07.2013 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
04.07.2013 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 13