Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2800323


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.12.2019 [2019/51]
18.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.11.2019  [2019/47]
28.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.07.2019  [2019/31]
23.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.12.2018  [2018/52]
16.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.12.2018  [2018/51]
09.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.12.2018  [2018/50]
12.10.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
05.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.11.2018  [2018/45]
28.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.10.2018  [2018/44]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
14.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.10.2018  [2018/42]
07.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.10.2018  [2018/41]
31.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.10.2018  [2018/40]
24.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.09.2018  [2018/39]
17.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.09.2018  [2018/38]
10.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.09.2018  [2018/37]
20.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.08.2018  [2018/34]
01.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.07.2018  [2018/27]
25.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.06.2018  [2018/26]
18.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.06.2018  [2018/25]
11.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.06.2018  [2018/24]
04.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.06.2018  [2018/23]
27.04.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.05.2018  [2018/22]
03.11.2017 (Expected) grant published on  06.12.2017  [2017/49]
31.10.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
31.10.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
27.10.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
09.07.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
23.06.2017 Change - classification published on  26.07.2017  [2017/30]
23.06.2017 Change - classification published on  26.07.2017  [2017/30]
02.12.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.02.2016 Amendment by applicant
06.11.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.07.2015 Change - classification published on  12.08.2015  [2015/33]
10.07.2015 Change - classification published on  12.08.2015  [2015/33]
10.07.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  12.08.2015  [2015/33]
06.03.2015 Change - extension states published on  08.04.2015  [2015/15]
04.12.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.11.2014  [2014/45]
03.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  05.11.2014  [2014/45]
29.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
05.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
10.07.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
16.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
05.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication