Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2800323 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201180075665 EP11878857



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2013097238Global Dossier 04.07.2013A1
Priority number Date
WO2011CN85182 31.12.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9313074Global Dossier 12.04.2016B2
US2014362953 11.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2011CN85182 31.12.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103999420BGlobal Dossier 14.11.2017B
CN103999420 20.08.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2011CN85182 31.12.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2800323Global Dossier 06.12.2017B1
EP2800323 12.08.2015A4
EP2800323 05.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2011CN85182 31.12.2011