Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2798467

EP2798467 - CONFIGURABLE REDUCED INSTRUCTION SET CORE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.03.2017
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip17.03.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.04.2017  [2017/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[2014/45]
Inventor(s)01 / MAKINENI, Srihari
5342 NW 131st Avenue
Portland Oregon 97229 / US
02 / KING, Steven R.
1895 NW 121st Pl.
Portland Oregon 97229 / US
03 / FANG, Zhen
5922 NW Snowlily Drive
Portland Oregon 97229 / US
04 / REDKIN, Alexander
Leninsky Prospect 160
St. Petersburg 196247 / RU
05 / IYER, Ravishankar
15934 NW Andalusian Way
Portland Oregon 97229 / US
06 / SMIRNOV, Pavel S.
LED1-508
Leninsky prospect 160
St. Petersburg 196247 / RU
07 / GUSEV, Dmitry
LED1-508
Leninsky prospect 160
St. Petersburg 196247 / RU
08 / PAVLOV, Dmitri
Iskrovsky pr. d. 32
korp. 1
kv120
St. Petersburg 193232 / RU
09 / WU, May
12708 NW Lilywood Dr.
Portland Oregon 97229 / US
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Fountain Precinct
Balm Green
Sheffield S1 2JA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]Hufton, David Alan
HGF Limited
Fountain Precinct
Balm Green
Sheffield S1 2JA / GB
Application number, filing date11878898.330.12.2011
WO2011US68016
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013101147
Date:04.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2798467
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013
[2014/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR04.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.03.2016
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/06, G06F9/30, G06F1/32
[2014/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
TitleGerman:KONFIGURIERBARER KERN MIT EINGESCHRÄNKTEM BEFEHLSSATZ[2014/45]
English:CONFIGURABLE REDUCED INSTRUCTION SET CORE[2014/45]
French:NOYAU CONFIGURABLE À JEU D'INSTRUCTIONS RÉDUIT[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase26.06.2014National basic fee paid 
26.06.2014Search fee paid 
26.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
26.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
26.10.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/16]
02.12.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201606   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US2008162891  (PITTMAN RICHARD NEIL [US] ET AL) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5752035  (TRIMBERGER STEPHEN M [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6886092  (DOUGLASS STEPHEN M [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[A]US2005086352  (ERIC BOISVERT ET AL.);
 [A]WO0219098  (VXTEL, INC.);
 [A]EP0283115  (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC.);
 [A]JP2001005660  (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES NORTH AMERICA CORP.)