Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2798520

EP2798520 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONTROLLING A MXCSR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.10.2017
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  11.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.10.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.11.2017  [2017/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[2014/45]
Inventor(s)01 / MAGKLIS, Grigorios
Edificio Nexus 2
C/Jordi Girona, 29
E-08034 Barcelona / ES
02 / CODINA, Josep M.
C/ Mas, 15, 3, 1
E-08903 Hospitalet de Llobregat / ES
03 / ZILLES, Craig B.
3600 Juliette Lane
Santa Clara, California 95054 / US
04 / NEILLY, Michael
10696 Rosewood Road Unit B
Cupertino, California 95014 / US
05 / SAMUDRALA, Sridhar
4212 Vail Divide
Austin, Texas 78738 / US
06 / MARTINEZ VICENTE, Alejandro
Edificio Nexus 2
C/Jordi Girona, 29
E-08034 Barcelona / ES
07 / XEKALAKIS, Polychronis
1000 Kiely Boulevard, Apt. 110
Santa Clara, California 95051 / US
08 / SANCHEZ, F. Jesus
Edificio Nexus 2
C/Jordi Girona, 29
E-08034 Barcelona / ES
09 / LUPON, Marc
Edificio Nexus 2
C/Jordi Girona, 29
E-08006 Barcelona / ES
10 / TOURNAVITIS, Georgios
Edificio Nexus 2
C/ Jordi Girona, 29
E-08034 Barcelone / ES
11 / GIBERT CODINA, Enric
Edificio Nexus 2
C/Jordi Girona, 29
E-08034 Barcelona / ES
12 / GOMEZ REQUENA, Crispin
Plaza Ceramista Gimeno 7, Puerta 1
E-46006 Valencia / ES
13 / GONZALEZ, Antonio
c/ Carles Riba 4 1º 2ª
E-08035 Barcelona / ES
14 / HYUSEINOVA, Mirem
Edificio Nexus 2
C/Jordi Girona, 29
E-08034 Barcelona / ES
15 / KOTSELIDIS, Christos E.
Johannes Kepler Universität
2nd floor
203 Institut für Systemsoftware
Altenbergerstr. 69
A-4040 Linz / AT
16 / LATORRE, Fernando
C\ Bolivia 126 1º - 3
E-08018 Barcelona / ES
17 / LOPEZ, Pedro
C/Menéndez Pelayo 36 5º 3ª
E-08750 Molins de Rei / ES
18 / MADRILES, Carlos
Edificio Nexus 2
C/Jordi Girona, 29
E-08012 Barcelona / ES
19 / MARCUELLO, Pedro
Rambla Guipuscoa 172 5-7
E-08020 Barcelona / ES
20 / MARTINEZ, Raul
Edificio Nexus 2
C/Jordi Girona, 29
E-08034 Barcelona / ES
21 / ORTEGA, Daniel
Edificio Nexus 2
C/Jordi Girona, 29
E-08034 Barcelona / ES
22 / PAVLOU, Demos
Edificio Nexus 2
C/Jordi Girona, 29
E-08034 Barcelona / ES
23 / STAVROU, Kyriakos A.
Edificio Nexus 2
C/Jordi Girona, 29
E-08024 Barcelona / ES
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Fountain Precinct
Balm Green
Sheffield S1 2JA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]Jennings, Vincent Louis
HGF Limited
Fountain Precinct
Balm Green
Sheffield S1 2JA / GB
Application number, filing date11878906.429.12.2011
WO2011US67957
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013101119
Date:04.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2798520
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013
[2014/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR04.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.11.2016
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/30, G06F9/38
[2016/49]
Former International [2014/45]G06F15/76, G06F9/30, G06F9/44
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR MXCSR-STEUERUNG[2014/45]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONTROLLING A MXCSR[2014/45]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE CONTRÔLER UN MXCSR[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase24.06.2014National basic fee paid 
24.06.2014Search fee paid 
24.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
24.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
07.06.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/48]
12.07.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201606   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2008082791  (CHENNUPATY SRINIVAS [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,6-8,12 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 7] - [0009] - [0013] , [0015] , [0026] * [I] 3-5,9-11,13-15;
 [I]US2002112145  (BIGBEE BRYANT E [US] ET AL) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [0032] *;
 [I]US2003126419  (GAO BAIMING [CN] ET AL) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0004] - [0015] *
International search[A]US2011047361  (ROUSSEL PATRICE);
 [A]US6691223  (GANESAN; ELANGO ET AL.);
 [A]US2007273698  (YUN DU ET AL.);
 [A]US6209083  (NAINI AJAY ET AL.)