EP2799312 - PANEL JOINING STRUCTURE AND PANEL JOINING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOTO, Toshihiro c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [2014/45] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | Smith, Samuel Leonard J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11878969.2 | 28.12.2011 | [2017/13] | WO2011JP80503 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013099018 | Date: | 04.07.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2799312 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2799312 | Date: | 29.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.07.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B62D25/20 | [2014/45] | CPC: |
B23K31/02 (EP,US);
B62D25/2036 (EP,US);
B62D27/026 (EP,US);
B23K2101/006 (EP,US);
F16B11/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STRUKTUR ZUR VERBINDUNG VON PLATTEN UND PLATTENVERBINDUNGSVERFAHREN | [2014/45] | English: | PANEL JOINING STRUCTURE AND PANEL JOINING METHOD | [2014/45] | French: | STRUCTURE D'ASSEMBLAGE DE PANNEAUX ET PROCÉDÉ D'ASSEMBLAGE DE PANNEAUX | [2014/45] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2014 | Translation filed | 02.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2014 | Search fee paid | 02.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 02.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/45] | 14.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.10.2016 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.12.2011 | AL | 29.03.2017 | AT | 29.03.2017 | CY | 29.03.2017 | CZ | 29.03.2017 | DK | 29.03.2017 | EE | 29.03.2017 | ES | 29.03.2017 | FI | 29.03.2017 | HR | 29.03.2017 | IT | 29.03.2017 | LT | 29.03.2017 | LV | 29.03.2017 | MC | 29.03.2017 | MK | 29.03.2017 | NL | 29.03.2017 | PL | 29.03.2017 | RO | 29.03.2017 | RS | 29.03.2017 | SE | 29.03.2017 | SI | 29.03.2017 | SK | 29.03.2017 | SM | 29.03.2017 | TR | 29.03.2017 | BG | 29.06.2017 | NO | 29.06.2017 | GR | 30.06.2017 | IS | 29.07.2017 | PT | 31.07.2017 | IE | 28.12.2017 | LU | 28.12.2017 | MT | 28.12.2017 | BE | 31.12.2017 | CH | 31.12.2017 | LI | 31.12.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 28.12.2011 | |
AT | 29.03.2017 | ||
CY | 29.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
MK | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
TR | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
IE | 28.12.2017 | ||
LU | 28.12.2017 | ||
MT | 28.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 28.12.2011 | |
AT | 29.03.2017 | ||
CY | 29.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
MK | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
IE | 28.12.2017 | ||
LU | 28.12.2017 | ||
MT | 28.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 28.12.2011 | |
AT | 29.03.2017 | ||
CY | 29.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
IE | 28.12.2017 | ||
LU | 28.12.2017 | ||
MT | 28.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 28.12.2011 | |
AT | 29.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
IE | 28.12.2017 | ||
LU | 28.12.2017 | ||
MT | 28.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
IE | 28.12.2017 | ||
LU | 28.12.2017 | ||
MT | 28.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
IE | 28.12.2017 | ||
LU | 28.12.2017 | ||
MT | 28.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
IE | 28.12.2017 | ||
LU | 28.12.2017 | ||
MT | 28.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
IE | 28.12.2017 | ||
LU | 28.12.2017 | ||
MT | 28.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
LU | 28.12.2017 | ||
MT | 28.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 29.03.2017 | |
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 29.03.2017 | |
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102006052643 (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0028] * | International search | [Y]JP2009214802 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [Y]JPH0391868U (DAIHATSU MOTOR CO., LTD.); | [Y]JPH0259882U (MAZDA MOTOR CORP.); | [Y]JPH01172977U (NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.); | [A]JPH0173441U (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP.) | by applicant | JP2011098619 | JP2007022262 | JP2010242943 | JP2009214841 |