Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2798470

EP2798470 - MANAGED INSTRUCTION CACHE PREFETCHING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.12.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.01.2018  [2018/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[2014/45]
Inventor(s)01 / STAVROU, Kyriakos A.
Jose Millan Gonzalez
E-08024 Barcelona / ES
02 / GIBERT CODINA, Enric
Intel Barcelona Research Center
Edificio Nexus 2
C/Jordi Girona 29
E-08034 Barcelona / ES
03 / CODINA, Josep M.
c/Mas 15 3 1
E-08903 Hospitalet de Llobregat / ES
04 / GOMEZ REQUENA, Crispin
Pl. Ceramista Gimeno 7-7
E-46006 Valencia / ES
05 / GONZALEZ, Antonio
c/ Charles Riba 4 1° 2a
E-08035 Barcelona / ES
06 / HYUSEINOVA, Mirem
Intel Barcelona Research Center
Edificio Nexus 2
C/Jordi Girona 29
E-08034 Barcelona / ES
07 / KOTSELIDIS, Christos E.
Johannes Kepler Universität
2nd floor
203 Institut für Systemsoftware
Altenbergerstr. 69
A-4040 Linz / AT
08 / LATORRE, Fernando
c/ Bolivia 126 1° -3
E-08018 Barcelona / ES
09 / LOPEZ, Pedro
c/ Menéndez Pelayo 36 5° 3a
E-08750 Molins de Rei / ES
10 / LUPON, Marc
c/ Jules Verne 2 2
E-08006 Barcelona / ES
11 / MADRILES, Carlos
c/ Torrent de I'Olla. 113 2°
E-08012 Barcelona / ES
12 / MAGKLIS, Grigorios
Intel Barcelona Research Center
Edificio Nexus 2
C/Jordi Girona 29
E-08034 Barcelona / ES
13 / MARCUELLO, Pedro
Rambla Guipuscoa 172 5-7
E-08020 Barcelona / ES
14 / MARTINEZ VICENTE, Alejandro
Intel Barcelona Research Center
Edificio Nexus 2
C/Jordi Girona 29
E-08034 Barcelona / ES
15 / MARTINEZ, Raul
Intel Barcelona Research Center
Edificio Nexus 2
C/Jordi Girona 29
E-08034 Barcelona / ES
16 / ORTEGA, Daniel
Intel Barcelona Research Center
Edificio Nexus 2
C/Jordi Girona 29
E-08034 Barcelona / ES
17 / PAVLOU, Demos
Intel Barcelona Research Center
Edificio Nexus 2
C/Jordi Girona 29
E-08034 Barcelona / ES
18 / TOURNAVITIS, Georgios
Intel Barcelona Research Center
Edificio Nexus 2
C/Jordi Girona 29
E-08034 Barcelona / ES
19 / XEKALAKIS, Polychronis
1000 Kiely Boulevard, Apt. 110
Santa Clara California 95051 / US
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Fountain Precinct
Balm Green
Sheffield S1 2JA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]Hufton, David Alan
HGF Limited
Fountain Precinct
Balm Green
Sheffield S1 2JA / GB
Application number, filing date11878987.429.12.2011
WO2011US67964
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013101121
Date:04.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2798470
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013
[2014/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR04.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/06, G06F9/30
[2014/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
TitleGerman:VERWALTETE BEFEHLSCACHESPEICHER-VORABLADUNG[2014/45]
English:MANAGED INSTRUCTION CACHE PREFETCHING[2014/45]
French:PRÉLECTURE D'ANTÉMÉMOIRE PAR INSTRUCTION GÉRÉE[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase13.06.2014National basic fee paid 
13.06.2014Search fee paid 
13.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
13.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
13.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.07.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/01]
23.08.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2018/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201606   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2006174090  (SARTORIUS THOMAS A [US] ET AL SARTORIUS THOMAS ANDREW [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO9803908  (IDEA CORP [US]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US7441110  (PUZAK THOMAS R [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15
International search[A]US2004215921  (ALEXANDER GREGORY W. ET AL.);
 [A]US2005210199  (ROBERT DIMPSEY ET AL.);
 [A]US2008140996  (MORROW MICHAEL WILLIAM ET AL.)