Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2798525

EP2798525 - COGNITIVE LOAD ASSESSMENT FOR DIGITAL DOCUMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.11.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  02.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.11.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.12.2018  [2018/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[2014/45]
Inventor(s)01 / LYONS, Kenton M.
2516 Rose Way
Santa Clara, California 95051 / US
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Goddar, Heinz J.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]Goddar, Heinz J.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date11879131.830.12.2011
WO2011US68012
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013101143
Date:04.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2798525
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013
[2014/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR04.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/00, G06K9/20, A61B5/16, G06F17/30, // A61B3/11, A61B3/113, G06F3/01
[2015/35]
Former International [2014/45]G06F17/00, G06K9/20
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
TitleGerman:KOGNITIVE LASTBEURTEILUNG FÜR DIGITALE DOKUMENTE[2014/45]
English:COGNITIVE LOAD ASSESSMENT FOR DIGITAL DOCUMENTS[2014/45]
French:ÉVALUATION DE CHARGE COGNITIVE POUR DOCUMENTS NUMÉRIQUES[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase13.06.2014National basic fee paid 
13.06.2014Search fee paid 
13.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
13.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
19.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.07.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/51]
03.08.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2018/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201707   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2010295774  (HENNESSEY CRAIG ADAM [CA]) [X] 1,2,4,10,11,15 * figures 1,2,3,5 * * paragraphs [0007] , [0025] , [0026] , [0029] , [0031] , [0033] , [0037] - [0042] - [0055] , [0056] * [I] 3,5-9,12-14;
 [A]  - NING ZHONG ET AL, "The impact of different forms of statistical information on reading efficiency, effect, and mental workload: An eye-tracking study", COMPLEX MEDICAL ENGINEERING (CME), 2011 IEEE/ICME INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20110522), doi:10.1109/ICCME.2011.5876712, ISBN 978-1-4244-9323-4, pages 97 - 102, XP031993553 [A] 1-15 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICCME.2011.5876712
International search[A]US2011207099  (CHEN FANG [AU], et al);
 [A]US2010039618  (DE LEMOS JAKOB [DK]);
 [A]US2007066916  (LEMOS JAKOB D [DK]);
 [A]US2010196861  (LUNNER THOMAS [DK])
by applicantUS2010295774