EP2788805 - OPTICAL CONNECTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development LP 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2016/25] | For all designated states Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development L.P. 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | ||
Former [2014/42] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEAUSOLEIL, Raymond G. 1501 Page Mill Road MS 1123 Palo Alto, California 94304-1123 / US | 02 /
FATTAL, David A. 1501 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, California 94304-1100 / US | 03 /
FIORENTINO, Marco 1501 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, California 94304-1100 / US | 04 /
ROSENBERG, Paul Kessler 1501 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, California 94304-1100 / US | [2014/42] | Representative(s) | HGF Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/42] | Hufton, David Alan HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 11879161.5 | 09.12.2011 | WO2011US64128 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013105919 | Date: | 18.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2788805 | Date: | 15.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.10.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/38, G02B6/34, G02B6/36 | [2014/42] | CPC: |
G02B6/3845 (EP,US);
G02B6/38 (KR);
G02B6/34 (KR,US);
G02B6/29304 (EP,US);
G02B6/36 (KR);
G02B6/3885 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/42] | Title | German: | OPTISCHE VERBINDUNGEN | [2014/42] | English: | OPTICAL CONNECTIONS | [2014/42] | French: | RACCORDEMENTS OPTIQUES | [2014/42] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2014 | Search fee paid | 30.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/42] | 29.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/49] | 27.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2002048422 (COTTEVERTE JEAN-CHARLES J C [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0067] - [0070] - [0072] , [0073]; figures 18,19,22 * [I] 4; | [XI]US2004008934 (TAKIGUCHI YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,7,8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0057] - [0059]; figure 6 * [I] 2,3,9,14,15; | [XI]US2005175304 (ROMAGNOLI MARCO [IT], et al) [X] 1,2,5 * paragraphs [0101] - [0113]; figures 6,7a,7b * [I] 4,6; | [A]WO2011093890 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US], et al) [A] 9 * abstract ** page 3, line 20 - page 4, line 13 * | International search | [Y]US2010092125 (KILIC ONUR [US], et al); | [A]US2010278488 (MIYAZAKI HIDEKI [JP]); | [Y]WO2011037563 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US], et al); | [A]US2011188805 (FU KAI-MEI CAMILLA [US], et al); | [A]US8070366 (THORSON KEVIN J [US], et al) | by applicant | US2004008934 |