Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2613223

EP2613223 - System and method for enhanced gesture-based interaction [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.03.2016
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.01.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SOFTKINETIC SOFTWARE
Boulevard de la Plaine, 11
1050 Brussels / BE
[2017/48]
Former [2013/28]For all designated states
SOFTKINETIC SOFTWARE
Boulevard de la Plaine, 15
1050 Brussels / BE
Inventor(s)01 / Pinault, Gilles
Boulevard Maurice Herbette, 67
1070 Anderlecht / BE
 [2013/28]
Representative(s)MFG Patentanwälte Meyer-Wildhagen Meggle-Freund Gerhard PartG mbB
Amalienstraße 62
80799 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/28]Mackett, Margaret Dawn , et al
Gevers & Vander Haeghen Holidaystraat 5
1831 Diegem / BE
Application number, filing date12000116.909.01.2012
[2013/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2613223
Date:10.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.06.2012
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/01, G06F3/033, A63F13/06
[2013/28]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/28]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:System und Verfahren zur verbesserten, auf Gesten basierenden Interaktion[2013/28]
English:System and method for enhanced gesture-based interaction[2013/28]
French:Système et procédé pour interaction améliorée basée sur des gestes[2013/28]
Examination procedure31.12.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.12.2013Examination requested  [2014/08]
06.03.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.09.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.12.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.03.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.03.2017Date of oral proceedings
04.05.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
04.05.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination29.06.2017Appeal received No.  T2287/17
04.09.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.03.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
30.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
20.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
26.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
22.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2008084385  (RANTA CRAIG STEVEN [US], et al) [X] 16,18-21,23 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0046] * * figures 2,3,4,5,6,7 * [Y] 1-15,17,22,24;
 [Y]US2007279380  (MURILLO BRUNO RAFAEL [US]) [Y] 9-12,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0045] * * figures 1, 2, 3, 6, 7 *;
 [Y]US2011202306  (ENG KYNAN [CH], et al) [Y] 7 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0075] *;
 [Y]  - Brandon Shrewsbury, "Providing Haptic Feedback Using the Kinect", Dundee, Scotland, UK, doi:10.1080/0963828, (20111026), URL: http://delivery.acm.org/10.1145/2050000/2049628/p321-shrewsbury.pdf?ip=145.64.134.241&acc=ACTIVE SERVICE&CFID=81283363&CFTOKEN=20492987&__acm__=1336574869_34ff99db206e9e7fbc69b1290d64c957, (20120509), XP055026739 [Y] 1-15,17,22,24 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2049536.2049628
 [A]  - FRATI V ET AL, "Using Kinect for hand tracking and rendering in wearable haptics", WORLD HAPTICS CONFERENCE (WHC), 2011 IEEE, IEEE, (20110621), doi:10.1109/WHC.2011.5945505, ISBN 978-1-4577-0299-0, pages 317 - 321, XP032008619 [A] 1-24 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/WHC.2011.5945505
ExaminationUS2011310002
 US2010144436
by applicantUS2010304868
 US2011269544